Zurich American Insurance Company v. Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Frank's International, LLC dba Blackhawk Specialty Tools, Glenn A. Miller, Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc., Catherine A. Miller, CNX Gas Company, LLC, John Doe Insurance Companies #1-10, National American Insurance Company, New Tech Global Ventures, LLC, Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC, Zachary T. Miller, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC, CONSOL Energy, Inc. and Frank's International, LLC doing business as Blackhawk Specialty Tools
Case Number: 2:2021cv03660
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTATION ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebekah B. Kcehowski as co-counsel; granting #33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew R. Divelbiss as co-counsel; granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Oliverio as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 28, 2021. (jlk) (jlk)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time, until 8/23/21, for the Defendants' to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/28/21. (sem)
July 28, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Elise Kraft Yarnell for Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. (Yarnell, Elise)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTATION ORDER granting #38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. answer due 8/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/28/21. (jr)
July 28, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Goldfarb for Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. (Goldfarb, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC answer due 8/23/2021; CNX Gas Company, LLC answer due 8/23/2021; CONSOL Energy, Inc. answer due 8/23/2021; Frank's International, LLC answer due 8/23/2021; Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC answer due 8/23/2021; National American Insurance Company answer due 8/23/2021; New Tech Global Ventures, LLC answer due 8/23/2021. (sem)
July 27, 2021 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/18/2022. by Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc.. (Agati, Andrew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Agati for Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. (Agati, Andrew)
July 27, 2021 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/23/2021. by Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Baumann, Jordan)
July 27, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8420873) of Michael P. Oliverio by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of M. Oliverio) (Kloss, William)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTATION ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Steinbrunner as co-counsel; granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles C. Conrad as co-counsel; granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tamara D. Bruno as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on July 21, 2021. (jlk)
July 20, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8411684) of Matthew R. Divelbiss by Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Baumann, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8411666) of Rebekah B. Kcehowski by Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Baumann, Jordan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Maluchnik, Crystal)
July 20, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by William Darrell Kloss, Jr for Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (Kloss, William)
July 19, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8408629) of Tamara D. Bruno by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 19, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8408597) of Charles C. Conrad by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 19, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8408580) of Ryan Steinbrunner by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC answer due 8/6/2021; National American Insurance Company answer due 8/6/2021. (jlk)
July 16, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 16, 2021 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 16, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC. (Maloney, Kevin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant National American Insurance Company. (Maloney, Kevin)
July 16, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION For Extension To Respond to Complaint by Defendants Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC, National American Insurance Company. (Maloney, Kevin)
July 15, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC, Frank's International, LLC. (Freudiger, Ray)
July 15, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: CNX Gas Company, LLC answer due 8/5/2021. (jlk)
July 14, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia L Pycraft for Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC (Pycraft, Tricia)
July 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M. Baumann for Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC (Baumann, Jordan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC of Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Baumann, Jordan)
July 12, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC. (Freudiger, Ray)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Frank's International, LLC. (Freudiger, Ray)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ray C Freudiger for Defendants Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC, Frank's International, LLC (Freudiger, Ray)
July 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: New Tech Global Ventures, LLC answer due 8/2/2021. (jlk)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION (Joint) Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. (Shrock, Steven)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Unsigned Service re #12 Certificate Mailing of the Clerk. (jlk)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant National American Insurance Company. National American Insurance Company served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc.. Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant New Tech Global Ventures, LLC. New Tech Global Ventures, LLC served on 6/25/2010, answer due 7/16/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.. Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Frank's International, LLC. Frank's International, LLC served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant CONSOL Energy, Inc.. CONSOL Energy, Inc. served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant CNX Gas Company, LLC. CNX Gas Company, LLC served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC. Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC served on 6/24/2010, answer due 7/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC, CNX Gas Company, LLC, CONSOL Energy, Inc., Frank's International, LLC, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC, National American Insurance Company, New Tech Global Ventures, LLC, Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc.. (jlk)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Maluchnik, Crystal)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8367485), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Zurich Policy No. GLO 4886998-08, #2 Exhibit 2: Zurich Policy No. GLO 0271984-00, #3 Exhibit 3: Zurich Policy No. GLO 4391263-07, #4 Exhibit 4: May 13, 2014 Master Drilling Contract, #5 Exhibit 5: March 27, 2014 Master Service Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6: November 6, 2012, #7 Exhibit 7: July 17, 2019 Miller Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons Form Summons to Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC, #10 Summons Form Summons to CNX Gas Company, LLC, #11 Summons Form Summons to Consol Energy Inc., #12 Summons Form Summons to Frank's International, LLC dba Blackhawk Specilaty Tools, #13 Summons Form Summons to Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., #14 Summons Form Summons to Mike's Power Tong Services, #15 Summons Form Summons to National American Insurance Company, #16 Summons Form Summons to New Tech Global Ventures, LLC, #17 Summons Form Summons to Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, LLC) (Maluchnik, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank's International, LLC dba Blackhawk Specialty Tools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Goldfarb
Represented By: Andrew Agati
Represented By: Elise Kraft Yarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNX Gas Company, LLC
Represented By: Jordan M. Baumann
Represented By: Matthew R Divelbiss
Represented By: Rebekah B. Kcehowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Companies #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National American Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Tech Global Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Shrock
Represented By: Bruno D. Tamara
Represented By: Charles Clayton Conrad
Represented By: Ryan Steinbrunner
Represented By: Tricia L Pycraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Power Tong Services, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Michael Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Represented By: Michael P. Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Specialty Tools, LLC
Represented By: Ray C Freudiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank's International, LLC doing business as Blackhawk Specialty Tools
Represented By: Ray C Freudiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Crystal L Maluchnik
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?