Mitchell v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kathy Mitchell
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv03888
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group identifying Other Affiliate Unum Group for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.. (Southam, Olivia)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Bacon, Brett)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America on 7/6/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Merry, Tony)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8389606), filed by Kathy Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Merry, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Mitchell
Represented By: Tony C Merry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brett K Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?