Hanna v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Hanna
Defendant: RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC. and Kevin Williams
Not Classified By Court: Robert M Kincaid
Case Number: 2:2021cv03889
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jlk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Brandon Hanna. (Breedlove, Trisha)
December 9, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Robert Kincaid to conduct mediation in Zoom Video. Mediation Hearing set for 1/12/2022 at 01:00 PM. (Kincaid, Robert)
November 30, 2021 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Robert M Kincaid assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in January 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
November 29, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL and SUBSTITUTION of Counsel by Defendants Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Kevin Williams. (Frantz, Monica) Modified text and termed motion on 11/29/2021 (er).
November 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in January 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 11/29/2021. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTATION ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Maureen Ross Knight. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 19, 2021. (jlk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Defendants Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Kevin Williams re #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8535271) of Maureen R. Knight Certificate of Good Standing (Connelly, Amanda)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Deficiency re: The motion does not contain certificate of good standing. Related Document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8535271) of Maureen R. Knight filed by Kevin Williams, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. Deficiency Deadline by 10/28/2021. (er)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8535271) of Maureen R. Knight by Defendants Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Kevin Williams. (Connelly, Amanda)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2021. Motions to Amend due by 10/25/2021. Initial Disclosures due by 10/25/2021. Discovery due by 4/14/2022. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 10/25/2021. Dispositive motions due by 6/25/2022. Mediation Deadline: 1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 4, 2021. (jlk)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER - re 10 Notice of Telephone Conference: The Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2021 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 4, 2021. (jlk)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Brandon Hanna. (Breedlove, Trisha)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ryder System, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental, Inc... (Connelly, Amanda)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Connelly for Defendants Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Kevin Williams (Connelly, Amanda)
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Connelly, Amanda) Modified text on 9/21/2021 (jlk).
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service re #3 Certificate of Mailing by the Clerk. Waiver previously submitted. (jlk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Breedlove, Trisha)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Kevin Williams on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Breedlove, Trisha)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: The Clerk of the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, mailed a copy of the Summons and Complaint via certified mail to the following Defendant(s): Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., 8750; Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., c/o Corporate Creations Network, Inc., 8743; and Kevin Williams, 8767. (jlk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Kevin Williams. (jlk)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8389711), filed by Brandon Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit) (Breedlove, Trisha) Modified text on 7/8/2021 (jlk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hanna
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Represented By: Paul Filippelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYDER TRUCK RENTAL, INC.
Represented By: Amanda M. Connelly
Represented By: Monica Lynn Frantz
Represented By: Maureen R Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Williams
Represented By: Amanda M. Connelly
Represented By: Monica Lynn Frantz
Represented By: Maureen R Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert M Kincaid
Represented By: Robert Myron Kincaid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?