Daubenmire v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Plaintiff: Georganne K. Daubenmire
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv03910
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The Court DEFERS setting a case scheduling order until after a ruling on the Motion for Order of Condemnation. (ECF No. 14.) The Court will schedule a conference and direct the filing of an amended Rule 26(f) Report, as necessary, at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2021. (jlk)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION Order of Condemnation by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (Cook, Jerome)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Rogers as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 18, 2021. (jlk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8452351) of Christopher A. Rogers by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cook, Jerome)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for August 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers is VACATED. (jv)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM, filed by Georganne K. Daubenmire. (Kiser, Jefferson) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jlk).
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION Counterclaim, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint , and COUNTERCLAIM against Georganne K. Daubenmire filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Cook, Jerome)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2021 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The parties are directed to call 1-877-336-1280, enter access code 7598806#, followed by security code 1234#. (sh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Snyder for Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Snyder, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, filed by Georganne K. Daubenmire.
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome W. Cook for Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Cook, Jerome)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Fairfield County, case number 21-cv-00261 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8395879), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Praecipe for Service, #3 Exhibit C: Clerks Certificate of Certified Mail, #4 Exhibit D: Summons, #5 Exhibit E: Proof of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, Jerome)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daubenmire v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georganne K. Daubenmire
Represented By: John Michael Snider
Represented By: Jefferson Mitchell Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Michael L Snyder
Represented By: Jerome W. Cook
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?