Muldrow v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Desiree Muldrow
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04275
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: The October 20, 2021 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 11/29/2021; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 11/29/2021; Discovery due by 4/15/2022; Dispositive motions due by 6/24/2022; Case is referred to Mediation in 2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/13/2021. (kk2)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Desiree Muldrow. (Breedlove, Trisha)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2021 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
September 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. answer due 10/26/2021. (er)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Stores, Inc. for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc... (Israel, Rachael)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION by the Parties for Leave to Plead by Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Israel, Rachael)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (er)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of mailing by the Clerk of the summons and complaint to Defendant Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. via certified mail (7020-3160-0001-9181-0391). (sem)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (er)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8471804), filed by Desiree Muldrow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x1, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue) (Breedlove, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muldrow v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Muldrow
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Rachael L. Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?