Hairston v. Bowen
Petitioner: Rico Isaih Hairston
Respondent: Warden Richard A. Bowen, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04385
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01644. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Transfer: For the reasons stated in the Order, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio for all further proceedings. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/8/2021. (O,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Copy of #3 Order of Transfer mailed to Rico Isaih Hairston A741324 at Ohio State Penitentiary 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road Youngstown, OH 44505 and to Richard A. Bowen, Jr., Warden, 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 9/8/2021. (O,K) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/24/2021. (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid. Filed by Rico Isaih Hairston. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Proceedings dated November 9, 2017- marked Exhibit C, #2 Journal Entry from the Court of Appeals of Ohio, Tenth Appellate District Case Number: 18AP-93, #3 Memorandum Decision dated April 15, 2021 from the Court of Appeals of Ohio, Tenth Appellate District, #4 Entry from the Supreme Court of Ohio dated July 20, 2021 Case Number: 2021-0675, #5 Judgment Entry from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Criminal Division, Case Number 17CR-1548, marked Exhibit G, #6 Entry from the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Criminal Division, marked Exhibits F 1-4, #7 Plea of Not Guilty from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, Criminal Division, marked Exhibit N, #8 envelope) (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of Doc. #1 Petition, Doc. #2 Administrative Track Initial Order, and a blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Rico Isaih Hairston at the Ohio State Penitentiary at 878 Coitsville-Hubbard Road, Youngstown, Ohio 44505 on 8/24/2021. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (G,M) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 9/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hairston v. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rico Isaih Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Richard A. Bowen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?