Honeycutt v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Honeycutt
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc. and General RV Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv04717
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Cassady, Andrew)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Or to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan filed by Plaintiff Joseph Honeycutt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit A) (Ipri, Steven) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2021: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (er). (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/20/2021- the document started with the proposed order; the Clerk updated the entry) (er).
October 15, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Timothy Abeel as to #6 Notice of Hearing was returned "Unable to Forward". (jlk) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/15/2021) (jlk).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER - The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/21 is VACATED. The hearing will be rescheduled, if needed, following a ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan (Doc. #8 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 10/6/21. (jr)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Cassady, Andrew)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Or to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Michigan by Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Cassady, Andrew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Cassady, Andrew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Cassady for Defendants General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Cassady, Andrew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Timothy J. Abeel. (er)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Washington County CPC on 8/17/2021 by Joseph Honeycutt against General RV Center & Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (er)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Washington County Ohio, case number 21OT000145 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8506137), filed by General RV Center, Thor Motor Coach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kwiatkowski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honeycutt v. Thor Motor Coach, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Honeycutt
Represented By: Steven M. Ipri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Motor Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew R Kwiatkowski
Represented By: Andrew Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General RV Center
Represented By: Andrew R Kwiatkowski
Represented By: Andrew Cassady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?