Gloss et al v. Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Gloss, Joseph Crase, Travis Morgan and Kyle Sanner
Defendant: Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04747
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Kyle Sanner, Anthony Gloss, Travis Morgan, Joseph Crase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. FLSA Consent Forms) (Mansell, Gregory)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Joseph Crase, Anthony Gloss, Travis Morgan, Kyle Sanner of Filing Consent Form - Precertification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chad Brown Consent Form) (Mansell, Gregory)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Herbert, Rhiannon)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND by Plaintiffs against Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8508652), filed by Kyle Sanner, Anthony Gloss, Travis Morgan, Joseph Crase. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Mansell, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gloss et al v. Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gloss
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Rhiannon Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Crase
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Rhiannon Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Morgan
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Rhiannon Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Sanner
Represented By: Gregory R Mansell
Represented By: Carrie J. Dyer
Represented By: Rhiannon Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stay Dry Waterproofing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?