Jeffers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Crystal E. Jeffers
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv04861
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Developments, #6 Disability Related Developments, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2) (Stark, John)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ameenah Lewis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Lewis, Ameenah)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Crystal E. Jeffers. (jlk)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In accordance with the Magistrate Judges General Order Concerning Social Security Appeals (S.D. Ohio E.D. January 1, 2016) and Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form and the Complaint required by Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1(a), which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen (15) days later. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 1, 2021. (jlk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #1 consent) (jlk).
October 1, 2021 SERVICE Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. (jlk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Crystal E. Jeffers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffers v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal E. Jeffers
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Ameenah Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?