Miller v. Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Devon Miller
Defendant: Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Hometown Hardwares, Inc., Ashville Ace Hardware, Baltimore Ace Hardware, Groveport Ace Hardware, Heath Ace Hardware, Richard E Foreman and Robin L Hayes
Case Number: 2:2021cv04867
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 02:30 PM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1280 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The conference access code is 7598806 and the security code is 1234. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (jlk)
November 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/14/2021. (jlk)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, of Plaintiff filed by Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Richard E Foreman, Robin L Hayes, Hometown Hardwares, Inc.. (Hawk, Morris)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Robin L Hayes. (er)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Richard E Foreman. (daf)
October 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendant's answers due 11/22/2021. (daf)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Baltimore Ace Hardware. The named Defendant was served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (daf)
October 28, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Leave of 21 Days to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Ashville Ace Hardware, Baltimore Ace Hardware, Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Richard E Foreman, Groveport Ace Hardware, Robin L Hayes, Heath Ace Hardware, Hometown Hardwares, Inc.. (Hawk, Morris)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Morris Lloyd Hawk for Defendants Ashville Ace Hardware, Baltimore Ace Hardware, Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Richard E Foreman, Groveport Ace Hardware, Robin L Hayes, Heath Ace Hardware, Hometown Hardwares, Inc. (Hawk, Morris)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Ashville Ace Hardware, Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Groveport Ace Hardware, Heath Ace Hardware, Hometown Hardwares, Inc.. Ashville Ace Hardware served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021; Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc. served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021; Groveport Ace Hardware served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021; Heath Ace Hardware served on 10/10/2021, answer due 11/1/2021; Hometown Hardwares, Inc. served on 10/12/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (daf)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (daf)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ashville Ace Hardware, Baltimore Ace Hardware, Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., Richard E Foreman, Groveport Ace Hardware, Robin L Hayes, Heath Ace Hardware, and Hometown Hardwares, Inc.. (daf)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8522404), filed by Devon Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons for Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc., #3 Summons Form Summons for Hometown Hardwares, Inc., #4 Summons Form Summons for Ashville Ace Hardware, #5 Summons Form Summons for Baltimore Ace Hardware, #6 Summons Form Summons for Heath Ace Hardware, #7 Summons Form Summons for Groveport Ace Hardware, #8 Summons Form Summons for Richard E. Foreman, #9 Summons Form Summons for Robin L. Hayes) (Scott, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Miller
Represented By: Joseph Francis Scott
Represented By: Kevin M. McDermott, II
Represented By: Ryan A. Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Builders Supply & Millwork, Inc.
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown Hardwares, Inc.
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashville Ace Hardware
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Ace Hardware
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groveport Ace Hardware
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Ace Hardware
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E Foreman
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin L Hayes
Represented By: Morris Lloyd Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?