LIVINGSTON v. YANA TRANSPORT, LLC
Plaintiff: MAUREEN LIVINGSTON
Defendant: YANA TRANSPORT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv04908
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Yana Transport, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chris P. Wido, Esq.) (Wido, Christopher)
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant YANA TRANSPORT, LLC & Statutory Agent Petroshenko. Defendant served on 10/21/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (er)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to YANA TRANSPORT, LLC (Statutory Agent). (er)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to YANA TRANSPORT, LLC. (er) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/5/2021- only 1 summons issued) (er).
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8523561), filed by MAUREEN LIVINGSTON. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wido, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIVINGSTON v. YANA TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN LIVINGSTON
Represented By: Christopher Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANA TRANSPORT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?