Mudrich v. The Sygma Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tyler Mudrich, Michael Morrow and Coty Mudrich
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv04932
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time. Named Plaintiff Mudrich must produce a Letter of Administration or Letter of Authority within sixty (60) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 02/21/2023. (tla)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/18/2023. to Produce a Letter of Administration by Plaintiff Coty Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Gedling, Adam)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form) (Hendren, Kelsie)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #57 Motion for Extension of Time and orders that Named Plaintiff Mudrich is granted leave to produce a Letter of Administration within THIRTY DAYS (30) of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 01/17/2023. (tla)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 2/15/2023. Letter of Administration by Plaintiff Coty Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Gedling, Adam)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice and Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Tristan Thomas Akers for Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich (Akers, Tristan)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Coty Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Substitute Party. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall have 60 days from the date of filing the instant motion to produce a Letter of Administration or Letter of Authority, identifying him as the Administrator of his brothers estate. Plaintiff shall have until January 16, 2023 to submit such a letter. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/21/2022. (cmw)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party and Request for Extension of Time to Produce a Letter of Administration by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Coty Mudrich, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Gedling, Adam)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER Denying as Motion #36 Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Provide Court-Supervised Notice to Certain Putative Collective Members by Text Message. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 11/9/2022. (cmw)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Text Message Notice) (Endicott, Samuel)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTATION ORDER granting #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #36 MOTION for Order to Provide Court-Supervised Notice to Certain Putative Collective Members by Text Message - Expedited Briefing Requested. Responses due by 11/9/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/4/2022. (agm)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 11/9/2022. by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Endicott, Samuel)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTATION ORDER - Pursuant to Southern District of Ohio Local Civil Rule 1.1, it is ORDERED that the default briefing schedule set forth in Local Civil Rule 7.2(a)(2) shall not apply to ECF No. #36 . Any Memoranda in Opposition are DUE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 2, 2022, and there will be no Reply. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/26/2022. (agm)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION for Order to Provide Court-Supervised Notice to Certain Putative Collective Members by Text Message - Expedited Briefing Requested. Responses due by 11/2/2022 (agm)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Order to Provide Court-Supervised Notice to Certain Putative Collective Members by Text Message - Expedited Briefing Requested by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Text Message Notice) (Coffman, Matthew)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Michael Morrow, Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF NO. #16 Plaintiffs conditional certification motion. Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/23/2022. (cmw)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint filed by The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Endicott, Samuel)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 First AMENDED Collective and Class Action COMPLAINT against The Sygma Network, Inc., filed by Tyler Mudrich, Michael Morrow. (agm)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTATION ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/7/2022. (agm)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective and Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and Ohio Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Coffman, Matthew)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #26 Suggestion of Death. (daf)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the Suggestion of Death Upon the Record was sent to Ms. Linda Mudrich-Haynie via certified mail. (er)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Tyler Mudrich by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Mudrich Death Certificate) (Endicott, Samuel)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form of Jose Rodriguez from California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich. (Coffman, Matthew)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A -- Katherine Dunham Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-- Jeffery Weber Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. C-- Plaintiff's Counsel's Letters) (Endicott, Samuel)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich re #17 Notice (Other),, #16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Supplemental Witness Statement in Support of ECF No. 16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Opt-In Plaintiff Troy Lobato) (Coffman, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The January 19, 2022 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2023. Motions to Amend due by 3/31/2023. Initial Disclosures due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/13/2022. (daf)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich re #16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) of Supplemental Witness Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Motion for Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-in Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Opt-In Plaintiff Michael Lawrence) (Coffman, Matthew)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Certify Class Conditional Class Certification and Court-Supervised Notice to Potential Opt-In Plaintiffs Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notice and Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tyler Mudrich, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Alexander Aragon, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Myson Donnelly, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Joshua Hurst, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Brian McCarty, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Daniel Pacheco, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Alexandro Sandoval) (Coffman, Matthew)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Endicott, Samuel)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/19/2022 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/9/2021. (agm)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION RE PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Endicott, Samuel)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants The Sygma Network, Inc., Sysco Holdings, LLC, Sysco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sysco Corporation, Corporate Parent Sysco Holdings, LLC for The Sygma Network, Inc... (Endicott, Samuel)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Sygma Network, Inc.. (Endicott, Samuel)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel E Endicott for Defendant The Sygma Network, Inc. (Endicott, Samuel)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Form) (Gedling, Adam)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Sygma Network, Inc. on 10/1/2021, answer due 11/30/2021. (Coffman, Matthew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Tyler Mudrich of Filing Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Forms) (Gedling, Adam)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Sygma Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8524732), filed by Tyler Mudrich. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mudrich Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mudrich v. The Sygma Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Mudrich
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morrow
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Represented By: Tristan Thomas Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coty Mudrich
Represented By: Matthew J.P. Coffman
Represented By: Adam C. Gedling
Represented By: Kelsie N Hendren
Represented By: Tristan Thomas Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sygma Network, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel E Endicott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?