Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., et al. v. Daimler Vans USA LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc. and Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.
Defendant: Daimler Vans USA LLC and Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv05077
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8643102) of Michael Jonathan Barker Pitt by Defendants Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Barr, Abigail)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8643095) of Steven J. Yatvin by Defendants Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Barr, Abigail)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8643073) of Lloyd E. Ferguson by Defendants Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Barr, Abigail)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine L Strauss for Defendants Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Strauss, Catherine)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail J. Barr for Defendants Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC (Barr, Abigail)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Mercedes-Benz USA LLC on 10/27/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Daimler Vans USA LLC on 10/27/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 & #10 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul R Norman and Sarah J Horner as co-counsel. Co-counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/26/2021. (kk2)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8558435) of Sarah J. Horner by Plaintiffs Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8558412) of Paul R. Norman by Plaintiffs Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (srb)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND REFILED against All Plaintiffs, filed by Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - re #1 Complaint filed by Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to refile the Complaint in its entirety within 14 DAYS. Deficiency Deadline by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on October 21, 2021. (jlk)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint: The document is not signed by an attorney and does not comply with Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a) or Local Rule 83.5(c). Deficiency Deadline due by 11/3/2021. (kk2)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. (Strasfeld, Stuart) Modified on 10/21/2021 (kk2)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8549279), filed by Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Strasfeld, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., et al. v. Daimler Vans USA LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart A Strasfeld
Represented By: Paul R Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart A Strasfeld
Represented By: Paul R Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart A Strasfeld
Represented By: Paul R Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler Vans USA LLC
Represented By: Abigail J. Barr
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By: Abigail J. Barr
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?