Myers v. Chambers-Smith
Plaintiff: Marvin Myers
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Case Number: 2:2021cv05191
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Rule 41(b). It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court not assess the filing fee in this matter. Finally, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court order Plaintiff to list this case (Case No. 2:21-cv-5191) as a related case if he refiles this action. Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/28/2021. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline by which Plaintiff must correct the deficiencies outlined in the Court's November 4, 2021 Order and Notice of Deficiency (ECF No. #3 ) is EXTENDED to DECEMBER 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/17/2021. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 17, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 12/18/2021. (daf)
November 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Marvin Myers (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Marvin Myers (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiff is ORDERED to correctthe deficiencies WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/4/2021. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Marvin Myers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Marvin Myers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers v. Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?