Howson v. Karafa et al
Plaintiff: David R Howson
Defendant: Jail Director Karafa, Jail Director Nicholas Karafa, Sheriff Russell Martin, Sergeant Amethyst Frost, Sergeant Scott Burden, Sergeant Jennifer Coy, Unknown Corrections Officer 1 and Unknown Corrections Officer 2
Case Number: 2:2021cv05199
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief and Order to Return Plaintiffs Legal Documents Held Unlawfully by Defendants by Plaintiff David R Howson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING AS MODIFIED the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of costs is DENIED, and he is ORDERED to pay the filing fee WITHIN THIRTY DAYS. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that failure to pay the filing fee will result in a dismissal for failure to prosecute. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/29/2021. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued in that it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 be DENIED. If this recommendation is adopted, it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be required to pay the filing fee within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of adoption. Objections to R&R due by 12/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/6/21. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff David R Howson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Service, #4 Envelope) (er)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, the appropriate initiating document accompanied by either the applicable filing fee ($402.00 for a civil Complaint) or alternatively, an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Deficiency Deadline by 12/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 4, 2021. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Provide Access to Type Complaint and Jury Demand in Case of a Denial of Access to Courts, 42 USC 1983 Action by Plaintiff David R Howson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howson v. Karafa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Howson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Director Karafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Director Nicholas Karafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Russell Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Amethyst Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Scott Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jennifer Coy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corrections Officer 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Corrections Officer 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?