Bennett v. Mertz et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bennett
Defendant: Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker and Christopher Dodge
Case Number: 2:2021cv05318
Filed: November 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTATION ORDER - The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for January 13, 2022 is VACATED. This case is STAYED for 90 days. The Parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report by April 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/7/22. (jr)
January 6, 2022 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Jeremy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ohio Department of Natural Resources Policy Directive) (Windham, Joshua)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by All Defendants. (Martin, Daniel)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Edmund Meyer for Defendants Christopher Dodge, Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker (Meyer, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
December 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Christopher Dodge answer due 1/3/2021; Mary Mertz answer due 1/3/2021; Kendra Wecker answer due 1/3/2021. (jlk)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Answer or Plead by Defendants Christopher Dodge, Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker. (Martin, Daniel)
December 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Martin for Defendants Christopher Dodge, Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker (Martin, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Christopher Dodge, Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker. Christopher Dodge served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021; Mary Mertz served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021; Kendra Wecker served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Gay, Joseph)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 , #4 , #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Gay, Joshua Windham and Robert Frommer. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/18/2021. (er)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8599108) of Robert Frommer by Plaintiff Jeremy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lewis, Patrick)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8599105) of Joshua Windham by Plaintiff Jeremy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lewis, Patrick)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8599098) of Joseph Gay by Plaintiff Jeremy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lewis, Patrick)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Dodge, Mary Mertz, Kendra Wecker. (jlk)
November 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8593949), filed by Jeremy Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Christopher Dodge, #3 Summons Form Kendra Wecker, #4 Summons Form Mary Mertz) (Lewis, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. Mertz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bennett
Represented By: Patrick T Lewis
Represented By: Joseph Randall Gay
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Windham
Represented By: Robert Peller Frommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Mertz
Represented By: Daniel J Martin
Represented By: Matthew Edmund Meyer
Represented By: Pearl M. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Wecker
Represented By: Daniel J Martin
Represented By: Matthew Edmund Meyer
Represented By: Pearl M. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Dodge
Represented By: Daniel J Martin
Represented By: Matthew Edmund Meyer
Represented By: Pearl M. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?