Folmar v. State of Ohio Human Resource Dept. et al
Plaintiff: Ian L Folmar
Defendant: State of Ohio Human Resource Dept., Commissioners Office City of Columbus, Franklin County, Judge Ted Barrows, Prosecutor Zach Klein's Office, Columbus Police Dept. and Columbus, Ohio Civil Protection Admn
Case Number: 2:2021cv05427
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER terminating #12 Motion for Hearing. This action remains CLOSED. The Court will NOT consider any additional filings from Plaintiff in this case. Accordingly, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to CEASE filing documents with the Court related to this action. All other filings will be STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 12, 2022. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Ted Barrows, Columbus Police Dept., Columbus, Ohio Civil Protection Admn, Commissioners Office City of Columbus, Franklin County, Prosecutor Zach Klein's Office, and State of Ohio Human Resource Dept. filed by Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
January 3, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Jury Trial and Court Date to be Set by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Evidence of Service, Motion to Pro Se Record/File by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar **THIS FILING IS A DUPLICATE OF ECF #4 ** - (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 29, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Clarification - Clerical by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTATION ORDER - The Court construes Plaintiffs #8 Notice to Stop All Action / Close Case as a motion for voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Plaintiffs #8 Motion is GRANTED. This case is hereby terminated. By Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 12/28/2021. (tb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 28, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to notation order on 12/28/2021. (tb)
December 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to Stop All Action / Close Case by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Ian L Folmar. The Court again DIRECTS Plaintiff to resubmit the documents he filed to initiate this action, with his minor childrens names redacted and replaced with the minors' initials only, within TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Plaintiff is also again DIRECTED to indicate in response to Question 1.B.of his Application/Motion to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (In Forma Pauperis) and Affidavit in Support Thereof what was the last year and month [he was] employed, as it appears Plaintiff did not respond to this question initially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 10, 2021. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant Ted Barrows Notice of Limited Appearance of Counsel (Spitzer, Ryan)
December 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION That This Specific Complaint Stopped, Sanitize, Shredded, and Deleted (US 5th Amend) by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Pro Se Record/File for Hearing Date to be Set (emergency) and Evidence of Service by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff is DIRECTED to redact the minor children's names and resubmit the documents with the minors initials only. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to resubmit the documents he filed to initiate this action, with these redactions WITHIN 14 DAYS OF re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Ian L Folmar. Deficiency Deadline by 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on November 22, 2021. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons Forms, US Marshal Forms, and copies of the Complaint for service) by Plaintiff Ian L Folmar (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Folmar v. State of Ohio Human Resource Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian L Folmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio Human Resource Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioners Office City of Columbus, Franklin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ted Barrows
Represented By: Ryan Conrad Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecutor Zach Klein's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus, Ohio Civil Protection Admn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?