Kister v. Athens County Sheriffs et al
Plaintiff: Chad Kister
Defendant: Athens County Sheriffs, Southeast Ohio Regional Jail and Jane & John Does
Case Number: 2:2021cv05428
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Add Secret Service, Addresses, Supplement Lawsuit by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
January 6, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Add Defendants to Lawsuit by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 29, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Supplement Lawsuit by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Re-File Lawsuit by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete and file the Application and Affidavit by Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, including a certified account statement or his institution's equivalent, WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/21/2021. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Add Causes for Relief by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons Forms, US Marshal Forms, and copies of the Complaint for service) by Plaintiff Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chad Kister. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (er)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons, Marshal and Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiff Chad Kister. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a properly supported application to proceed without prepayment of fees WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/22/2021. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Lawsuit for Unsecuring My House against Athens County Sheriffs, Jane & John Does, and Southeast Ohio Regional Jail filed by Chad Kister (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. Athens County Sheriffs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens County Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Ohio Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane & John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?