Kister v. State of Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Chadwick Kister
Defendant: State of Ohio and Athens Common Pleas Court
Case Number: 2:2021cv05917
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Chadwick Kister. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Mr. Kister shall include the appropriate Case Number on any document he submits for filing. If the document is to be filed as a new action, he shall indicate "NEW CASE NO. _____" on the first page. Any document that is submitted to the Clerk without a case number, and without indicating that it is for a New Case, will be returned by the Clerk. Kister shall also submit a "Notice of Address" in each case that provides the precise Name, inmate number (if any), and address at which he can receive mail. If he is moved or released, he shall promptly file a "Notice of New Address" with the Court in each case. Kister is ORDERED file a fully completed Application and Affidavit by Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, including the signed declaration page, WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Deficiency Deadline due by 2/17/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/27/2022. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
January 26, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Chadwick Kister as to re #4 MOTION to Amend/Correct. (Attachments: #1 NEF stating ECF No. #4 was filed) (daf)
January 10, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend Supplement Lawsuit by Plaintiff Chadwick Kister. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (er)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/7/2022. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: If Plaintiff intends to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED to submit the requisite $402.00 filing fee or fully complete the Court's Application and Affidavit by Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees w/in thirty (30) days. Deficiency Deadline by 1/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/29/2021. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons forms and Marshal forms) by Plaintiff Chadwick Kister. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (er) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/30/2021) (jlk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kister v. State of Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick Kister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Athens Common Pleas Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?