Allah v. Chambers Smith et al
Plaintiff: El-Barseem K. Allah
Defendant: Annette Chambers Smith, Ron Erdos, L. Mahlman, Lt. Haywood, Mr. Oppy, Donald Morgan, Todd Diehl, Officer Harmon, Lt. John Doe, T Driesbach and Benjamin Murphy
Case Number: 2:2022cv00021
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File, Amended Supplemental Complaint: Memorandum Attached and Hereto Incorporated by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER denying #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Correct Deficiency as moot. Plaintiff has provided the needed service documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/4/22. (jr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Correct Deficiency by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. New date requested 3/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tla)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A and B, #2 Envelope) (daf)
February 18, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Discovery of Designated documents pursuant USCS Fed rules Civ Proc Rule 34(a) by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (vb)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (vb)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a US Marshal Form for Defendant Todd Diehl w/in fourteen (14) days. Deficiency Deadline due by 2/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/14/2022. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
February 9, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Todd Diehl, John Doe, T Driesbach, Harmon, Haywood, and Benjamin Murphy (kk2)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; and granting #3 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Having performed the initial screen of the #7 Combined Complaint, it is RECOMMENDED that the Court allow Plaintiff to proceed on: 1) the legal mail claim against Lt. Haywood, SOCF Mailroom Supervisor; and 2) the missing package claim against Todd Diehl, Institutional Inspector; Officer Harmon, RCI Warehouse Supervisor; Lt. John Doe, RCI Mailroom Supervisor; and T. Driesbach and Benjamin Murphy, of the RCI mailroom (in their individual capacities). It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS the remaining claims, including the claims for monetary damages against the Defendants in their official capacities, the claims against ODRC Director Chambers Smith, SOCF Warden Erdos, and RCI Warden Morgan, and the institutional grievance procedure claim. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that any appeal by Plaintiff would not be taken in good faith and that he may not proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Objections to R&R due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/9/2022. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 9, 2022 Filing 7 COMBINED COMPLAINT against Annette Chambers Smith, Todd Diehl, John Doe, T Driesbach, Ron Erdos, Harmon, Haywood, L. Mahlman, Donald Morgan, Benjamin Murphy, and Oppy filed by El-Barseem K. Allah (Attachments: #1 Addendum Amended Complaint 3-1, #2 Amended Complaint / Statement of Claim 4, #3 Amended Complaint Exhibits 4-1) (kk2)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting #3 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/9/2022. (This entry is for statistical purposes only. Please see ECF No. #8 for document) (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Admission of Exhibit (F) by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Envelope) (daf)
January 27, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from El-Barseem K. Allah requesting copies from the Clerk. (jlk)
January 24, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT/ STATEMENT OF CLAIM against All Defendants, filed by El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Summons and US Marshal Forms, #3 Envelope 1, #4 Envelope 2) (daf) .
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Envelope) (daf)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons Forms, US Marshal Forms, and Service Copies) by Plaintiff El-Barseem K. Allah. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allah v. Chambers Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El-Barseem K. Allah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Chambers Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Erdos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mahlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Oppy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Driesbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?