Monday v. White Hawk Retail Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Quetin Monday
Defendant: White Hawk Retail Services, LLC doing business as Falcon Retail Services and Falcon Retail Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00041
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. Receipt number AOHSDC-8740571. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
March 1, 2022 Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. Receipt number AOHSDC-8740493. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
March 1, 2022 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. Receipt number AOHSDC-8740400. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
March 1, 2022 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Falcon Retail Services LLC. (er)
March 1, 2022 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #9 , #10 & #11 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Quetin Monday and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #9 , #10 & #11 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Quetin Monday as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 3/2/2022. Please use the event - AMENDED DOCUMENT - NON-MOTION. (er)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Reschedule the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference is rescheduled to take place on 4/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1280 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The conference access code is 7598806 and the security code is 1234. The previously scheduled conference on 3/3/2022 is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on February 28, 2022. (jlk)
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION Joint Request to Reschedule the Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Alexander, William)
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Alexander, William)
February 24, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against White Hawk Retail Services, LLC, Falcon Retail Services LLC, filed by Quetin Monday. (Alexander, William)
February 24, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8740571) of William Clifton Alexander by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
February 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8740493) of Carter T. Hastings by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
February 24, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8740400) of Austin Winters Anderson by Plaintiff Quetin Monday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
February 7, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant White Hawk Retail Services, LLC. Answer. (Cooper, James)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #5 Answer to Complaint filed by White Hawk Retail Services, LLC., and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #5 Answer to Complaint filed by White Hawk Retail Services, LLC. as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/7/2022. (er)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant White Hawk Retail Services LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by White Hawk Retail Services, LLC. (Cooper, James)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Quetin Monday re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt) (DeRose, Robert)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Plaintiff Quetin Monday of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Temarcus Jenkins) (DeRose, Robert)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to White Hawk Retail Services, LLC. (er)
January 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against White Hawk Retail Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8662946), filed by Quetin Monday. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Consent of Quetin Monday) (DeRose, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monday v. White Hawk Retail Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quetin Monday
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Hawk Retail Services, LLC doing business as Falcon Retail Services
Represented By: James Reynolds Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Retail Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?