Rollins v. CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamey Rollins
Defendant: CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc. and Matt Evans
Not Classified By Court: Charles R. Dyas, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00137
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
January 12, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Jamey Rollins. (Breedlove, Trisha)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file a joint written report detailing the status of this case by January 16, 2023, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/2/2022. (daf)
September 28, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation Hearing re-set for 10/20/2022 at 09:00 AM. (agm)
August 17, 2022 Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint filed by CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc., Matt Evans. (Holthus, Douglas)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc., Matt Evans, filed by Jamey Rollins. (daf)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint Instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/2/2022. (daf)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Instanter by Plaintiff Jamey Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Breedlove, Trisha)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Charles R. Dyas, Jr. to conduct mediation in ZOOM. Mediation Hearing set for 9/21/2022 at 09:00 AM. (Dyas, Charles)
July 14, 2022 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Charles R Dyas Jr assigned as mediator to this case. Previously assigned mediator reported a conflict. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in August 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
July 6, 2022 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Andrew Biller assigned as mediator to this case. Previously assigned mediator requested to be removed from the case. Within 14 days, the new mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in August 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
July 5, 2022 NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Sarah Pollyea assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in August 2022, or within 60 days of this notice. The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
June 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in August 2022. If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 7/1/2022. (kk2)In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the parties and mediators are ENCOURAGED to attempt mediation via telephone or video conference.
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The June 8, 2022 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 6/27/2022. Motions to Amend due by 6/27/2022. Initial Disclosures due by 6/27/2022. Discovery due by 2/5/2023. Dispositive motions due by 4/5/2023. Settlement Demand due by 7/1/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/15/2022. Mediation Deadline: 8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/2/2022. (daf)
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Jamey Rollins. (Breedlove, Trisha)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2022 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Holthus, Douglas)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc. on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; Matt Evans on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Shumaker, Gregory)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc., and Matt Evans. (daf)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8675642), filed by Jamey Rollins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Summons x3) (Filippelli, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollins v. CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamey Rollins
Represented By: Paul Filippelli
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEVA Logistics U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Paul Holthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Evans
Represented By: Douglas Paul Holthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Charles R. Dyas, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Richard Dyas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?