Preserve Partners, Inc. v. Sawmill Park Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Preserve Partners, Inc.
Defendant: Sawmill Park Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00477
Filed: February 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTATION ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Warren; denying as moot without prejudice #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/7/2022. (agm)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sawmill Park Properties, LLC, filed by Preserve Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - the Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Letter) (St. Cyr, Emily)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2022. Motions to Amend due by 5/13/2022. Initial Disclosures due by 4/1/2022. Discovery due by 9/16/2022. Dispositive motions due by 10/19/2022. Primary Expert due by 6/17/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/15/2022. Settlement Demand due by 4/29/2022. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/13/2022. Mediation Deadline: 6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/24/2022. (daf)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Statistical Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2022. (agm)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTATION ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason Yert. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 03/18/2022. (vb)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 162130) of Jason Yert by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Winchester, Brian)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Preserve Partners, Inc.. (St. Cyr, Emily)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. St. Cyr for Plaintiff Preserve Partners, Inc. (St. Cyr, Emily)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document: #7 & #8 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. Deficiency Deadline by 3/22/2022. (er)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 3/24/2022 12:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8754192) of Emily Warren by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Winchester, Brian)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8754192) of Jason Yert by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Winchester, Brian)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Winchester, Brian)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #4 Complaint. Sawmill Park Properties, LLC answer due 3/16/2022. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/11/2022. (agm)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Sawmill Park Properties, LLC, filed by Preserve Partners, Inc.. (agm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/14/2022- the document is now in searchable format) (er).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/16/2022. by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Winchester, Brian)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22cv-01-88 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8711971), filed by Sawmill Park Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Franklin County filings, #2 Exhibit Declaration) (Winchester, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preserve Partners, Inc. v. Sawmill Park Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preserve Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Kara Marie Mundy
Represented By: Emily E. St. Cyr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sawmill Park Properties, LLC
Represented By: Brian T Winchester
Represented By: Jason C. Yert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?