Red Roof Franchising, LLC et al v. Srivigna Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Red Roof Franchising, LLC and RRI Financial, Inc.
Defendant: Srivigna Management, Inc., Srinath Dharmapadam, Purvi S. Dharmapadam and Sunil Chanchala
Case Number: 2:2022cv01936
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Srinath Dharmapadam. (Barmen, Bradley)
June 3, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2022 10:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 26, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time by Defendant Srivigna Management, Inc.. (Sefton, Warren)
May 26, 2022 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Purvi S. Dharmapadam. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tla)
May 16, 2022 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Srinath Dharmapadam.(3180) (jlk)
May 16, 2022 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Srivigna Management, Inc. Srivigna Management, Inc. served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. (jlk)
May 16, 2022 Filing 19 Alias Summons Issued as to Purvi S. Dharmapadam. (jlk) Replaced document on 5/18/2022 (tla).
May 16, 2022 Filing 18 Alias Summons Issued as to Srinath Dharmapadam. (jlk)
May 16, 2022 Filing 17 Alias Summons Issued as to Sunil Chanchala. (jlk) Replaced document on 5/18/2022 (tla).
May 16, 2022 Filing 16 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Purvi S. Dharmpadam (Barmen, Bradley)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Sunil Chanchala (Barmen, Bradley)
May 16, 2022 Filing 14 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Srinath Dharmpadam (Barmen, Bradley)
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Sunil Chanchala. (jlk)
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er)
April 22, 2022 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Sunil Chanchala, Purvi S. Dharmapadam, Srinath Dharmapadam, Srivigna Management, Inc. (jlk) (Main Document 11 replaced to include all summons issued on 4/25/2022) (jlk).
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Srinath Dharmpadam (Barmen, Bradley)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Sunil Chanchala (Barmen, Bradley)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Srivigna Management, Inc. (Barmen, Bradley)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Purvi S. Dharmapadam (Barmen, Bradley)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs RRI Financial, Inc., Red Roof Franchising, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Termination and Release, #2 Exhibit Ex B Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit Ex C Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit Ex D Demand to Cease and Desist) (Barmen, Bradley)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c): The Clerk's Office has reviewed your filing, docket #1 Complaint, filed by Red Roof Franchising, LLC, RRI Financial, Inc. and it appears that one or more of the PDFs are not text searchable and therefore is not in compliance with Local Rule 5.1 (c). You shall refile docket #1 Complaint as a text searchable document(s), linking the document back to the original entry within 24-hours. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 4/15/2022. (vb)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs RRI Financial, Inc., Red Roof Franchising, LLC. (Barmen, Bradley)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiffs RRI Financial, Inc., Red Roof Franchising, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Barmen, Bradley)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sunil Chanchala, Purvi S. Dharmapadam, Srinath Dharmapadam, Srivigna Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8816827), filed by Red Roof Franchising, LLC, RRI Financial, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Termination and Release, #2 Exhibit Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit Franchise Agreement, #4 Exhibit Demand to Cease and Desist) (Barmen, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Roof Franchising, LLC et al v. Srivigna Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Roof Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Bradley J Barmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRI Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley J Barmen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srivigna Management, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Jeffrey Sefton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Srinath Dharmapadam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purvi S. Dharmapadam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunil Chanchala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?