Daimler Vans USA LLC v. Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daimler Vans USA LLC
Defendant: Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc. and Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02910
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Based upon the parties' Report pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court ADOPTS the following schedule: Joinder of Parties due by 10/21/2022. Motions to Amend due by 10/21/2022. Discovery due by 6/8/2023. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 9/30/2022. Dispositive motions due by 9/6/2023. Primary Expert due by 3/17/2023. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/14/2023. Settlement Demand due by 6/22/2023. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/6/2023. Mediation Deadline: 7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 09/13/2022. (tla)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 26(f) REPORT Revised by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Barr, Abigail)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Oral MOTION to Stay Discovery. (sln)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Oral ORDER Denying Motion to Stay Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/25/2022. (sln)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/25/2022. Parties to submit revised Rule 26(f) Report by 9/1/2022. (sln)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Barr, Abigail)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTATION ORDER ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carmel I. Dooling. Co-counsel are directed to file for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/22. (ds)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven J. Yatvin. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/22. (ds)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTATION ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael D. Educate. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/22. (ds)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8991258) of Carmel I. Dooling by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Barr, Abigail)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8991249) of Steven J. Yatvin by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Barr, Abigail)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8991211) of Michael D. Educate by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Barr, Abigail)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul R. Norman. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/22. (ds)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Horner. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER if they have not already done so. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/4/22. (ds)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8989434) of Paul R. Norman by Defendants Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8989409) of Sarah Jeanette Horner by Defendants Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart Allen Strasfeld for Defendants Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. (Strasfeld, Stuart)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Barr, Abigail)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc. on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Barr, Abigail)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc. on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. (Barr, Abigail)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Barr, Abigail)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail J. Barr for Plaintiff Daimler Vans USA LLC (Barr, Abigail)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Daimler Vans USA LLC, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC for Daimler Vans USA LLC.. (Strauss, Catherine)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc., Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: BOHSDC-8968675), filed by Daimler Vans USA LLC. (Strauss, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daimler Vans USA LLC v. Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daimler Vans USA LLC
Represented By: Abigail J. Barr
Represented By: Catherine L Strauss
Represented By: Carmel I. Dooling
Represented By: Michael D. Educate
Represented By: Steven J. Yatvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fyda Freightliner Cincinnati, Inc.
Represented By: Paul R. Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Represented By: Stuart Allen Strasfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fyda Freightliner Columbus, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Allen Strasfeld
Represented By: Paul R. Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fyda Freightliner Pittsburgh, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Allen Strasfeld
Represented By: Paul R. Norman
Represented By: Sarah Jeanette Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?