Givens v. Shadyside Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Greg Givens |
Defendant: |
Code Enforcer Joseph E Klug, Shadyside Police Department, Chief Donald L Collette, Assistant Chief Jeffrey Todd Loeffler and Joe Klug |
Case Number: |
2:2022cv04268 |
Filed: |
December 2, 2022 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio |
Presiding Judge: |
Kimberly A Jolson |
Referring Judge: |
Edmund A Sargus |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 7, 2023 |
Filing
14
ORDER: The 10 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED and AFFIRMED. Mr. Givens is ORDERED to pay the $402 filing fees ($350 filing fee plus $52 administrative fee) within thirty days to proceed. The Court ADVISES Mr. Givens that if he d oes not pay the filing fees in full within thirty days, his case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. The Court further CERTIFIES pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal of this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 6/7/2023. (merc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
April 26, 2023 |
Filing
10
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the Court (1) DENY Plaintiff's First, Second, and Third Motions to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 1 , 3 , 8 ) and ORDER him to pay the $402.00 filing fee required to commence this action w/in thi rty (30) days; (2) ADVISE Plaintiff that his case will be dismissed for want of prosecution w/in thirty (30) days if he does not pay the filing fee in full; (3) CERTIFY pursuant to 28 USC §1915(a)(3) that an appeal of any Order adopting this Rep ort and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 5/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/26/2023. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?