Singleton v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Michael D. Singleton
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2023cv00164
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Peter B Silvain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - This habeas corpus matter is before the Court on Petitioners motion for an extension of time to pay the filing fee. (Doc. #4 ). The Motion is GRANTED. Petitioner must pay the filing fee WITHIN THIRTY DAYS of this Order. In the alternative, Petitioner may submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis WITHIN THIRTY DAYS. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Petitioner a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis that is used by prisoners in this Court( Status Report due by 4/3/2023.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 3/3/23. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner IFP Application) (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Filing Fee by Petitioner Michael D. Singleton. (er)
February 4, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (signed), filed by Michael D. Singleton. (kh)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael D. Singleton (Deficiency Deadline by 2/21/2023.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr on 1/20/2023. (srb)(This document along with the petitioner petition has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael D. Singleton., (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael D. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?