Root, Inc. et al v. Silver et al
Plaintiff: Root, Inc., Caret Holdings, Inc. and Root Insurance Agency, LLC
Defendant: Brinson Caleb Silver, William Campbell, Collateral Damage, LLC, Eclipse Home Design, LLC, Quantasy & Associates, LLC, Paige McDaniel and Lauren Lanskie
Case Number: 2:2023cv00512
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTATION ORDER granting #53 (Agreed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint. William Campbell answer due 5/4/2023; Quantasy & Associates, LLC answer due 5/4/2023. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/28/2023. (agm)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (Agreed) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Amended Complaint by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. New date requested 5/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ridings, Matthew) Modified on 3/28/2023 to clarify text (kk2)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as to defendant Paige McDaniel:1. McDaniel shall not individually, nor through others (including but not limited to any entity McDaniel owns or controls whether in whole or part) use, convert, sell or otherwise dispose of any assets in her possession, custody, and control totaling more than $5,000 without leave of this Court;2. McDaniel shall not individually, nor through others (including but not limited to any entity McDaniel owns or controls whether in whole or part), incur charges or cash advances on any credit card, debit card, or checking card or incur liens or encumbrances on real personal property or other assets, including intangible assets. Notwithstanding, McDaniel may pay personal expenses for day-to-day living in an amount no greater than $5,000 per month.3. Root is not required to post bond. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 3/22/2023. (merc)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Agreed Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (King, Jamar)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTATION ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew L. Kutcher. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/15/2023. (er)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9314267) of Matthew L. Kutcher by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTATION ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristine A Forderer as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/10/2023. (kk2)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9310073) of Kristine A. Forderer by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Paige McDaniel on 3/6/2023, answer due 5/5/2023. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTATION ORDER to Reset Hearings: At the request of counsel for Plaintiff, the Preliminary Injunction Hearing is rescheduled to 3/23/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 132 - Columbus before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 3/8/2023. (merc)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and First Amended Complaint served on Paige McDaniel on 2/16/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION shall remain in effect until further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/27/2023. (merc)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Agreed Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Root, Inc.. (Saalman, Grace)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTATION ORDER granting #38 & #39 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua H Epstein and Eva M Jimenez as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/27/2023. (kk2)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9289195) of Eva M. Jimenez by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (King, Jamar)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9289179) of Joshua H. Epstein by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (King, Jamar)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #26 and #27 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven A. Block and Karim Sabbidine as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 02/23/2023. (tla)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTATION ORDER The Court held a telephone status conference in this matter. Counsel for Plaintiffs appeared, along with counsel for all Defendants except Ms. McDaniel. As discussed in that conference, the discovery response deadline established in the Courts 2/16/2023 #29 Order is VACATED. The governance of discovery will revert to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/22/2023. (merc)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah D. Morrison: Telephone Conference held on 2/21/2023 (being docketed for statistical purposes only). (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (merc)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Brinson Caleb Silver on 2/16/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthew Scott for Defendants Collateral Damage, LLC, Eclipse Home Design, LLC, Brinson Caleb Silver (Scott, David)
February 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 2/21/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. (md) (md).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Jones for Defendants Collateral Damage, LLC, Eclipse Home Design, LLC, Brinson Caleb Silver (Jones, Aaron)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Root's Motion is GRANTED in part. The matter is hereby set for a preliminary injunctionhearing on March 9, 2023, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 132. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/16/2023. (merc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Written discovery requests shall be sent by close of business on 2/17/2023. Responses shall be due 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 2/16/2023. (merc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Informal Preliminary Conference held on 2/16/2023 (being docketed for statistical purposes only). (Court Reporter: Allison Kimmel) (merc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9273110) of Steven A. Block by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Steven A. Block) (King, Jamar)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9276407) of Karim Sabbidine by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts) (King, Jamar)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Root, Inc.. (Saalman, Grace)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order RESPONSE to Discovery Request due by all parties on 3/3/2023. (merc)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/9/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 132 - Columbus before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. (merc)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9273110) of Steven A. Block: The motion does not contain the required certificate of good standing from the highest court of a State. Deficiency Deadline by 3/1/2023. (kk2)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTATION HEARING NOTICE of Informal Conference pursuant to Local Rule 65.1 on #21 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Informal Conference set for 2/16/2023 12:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Sarah D. Morrison. Call-in number: (888) 684-8852. Access code: 5465115#. (merc)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9273110) of Steven A. Block by Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Steven A. Block) (King, Jamar)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT to #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Caret Holdings, Inc., Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42) (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Alias Summons Issued as to Brinson Caleb Silver. (er)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamar TaeVann King for Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC (King, Jamar)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Ridings for Defendants William Campbell, Quantasy & Associates, LLC (Ridings, Matthew)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Returned Executed: Paige McDaniel served on 2/8/2023, answer due 3/1/2023SEE DOCKET #16 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Summons Returned Executed," which can be found in the "Service of Process" Section of CM/ECF, and to set the service and answer due dates for the party served (kk2)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Paige McDaniel on 2/8/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Collateral Damage, LLC on 2/3/23, filed by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lauren Lanskie on 2/3/23, filed by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED WAIVER by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. . (Alexander, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/6/2023 (jlk).
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED Waiver by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. . (Alexander, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/6/2023 (jlk).
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance Local Rule 5.1 (c) re #8 & #9 Waivers of Service Executed filed by Root Insurance Agency, LLC and Root, Inc. Non-Compliance Deadline due by 2/7/2023. (kk2)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Quantasy & Associates, LLC on 2/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to William Campbell on 2/3/2023, answer due 4/4/2023. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Eclipse Home Design, LLC served on 2/3/2023, answer due 2/24/2023. (jlk)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Eclipse Home Design LLC on 2/3/23, filed by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Campbell, Collateral Damage, LLC, Eclipse Home Design, LLC, Lauren Lanskie, Paige McDaniel, Quantasy & Associates, LLC & Brinson Caleb Silver. (er)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Root Insurance Agency, LLC, Root, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Root, Inc. for Root Insurance Agency, LLC.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Caret Holdings, Inc., Root, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Root, Inc. for Caret Holdings, Inc... (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Root, Inc.. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Alexander, Elizabeth)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9253362), filed by Root, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alexander, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Root, Inc. et al v. Silver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Root, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Alexander
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Saalman
Represented By: Kristine Anne Forderer
Represented By: Matthew L. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caret Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Saalman
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Alexander
Represented By: Kristine Anne Forderer
Represented By: Matthew L. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Root Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Saalman
Represented By: William Darrell Kloss, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Alexander
Represented By: Kristine Anne Forderer
Represented By: Matthew L. Kutcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinson Caleb Silver
Represented By: Aaron Jones
Represented By: David Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Campbell
Represented By: Matthew David Ridings
Represented By: Eva Mia Jimenez
Represented By: Jamar TaeVann King
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Karim Sabbidine
Represented By: Steven Andrew Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collateral Damage, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Jones
Represented By: David Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Home Design, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Jones
Represented By: David Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantasy & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Karim Sabbidine
Represented By: Matthew David Ridings
Represented By: Eva Mia Jimenez
Represented By: Jamar TaeVann King
Represented By: Steven Andrew Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Lanskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?