NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots v. NetJets Aviation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc. and NetJets, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01404
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 151 Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/31/2023. (kk2)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Petroff, D.) Modified filing event for statistical purposes on 5/31/2023 (kk2)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2023 is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 5/30/2023; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 9/15/2023; Discovery due by 10/16/2023; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 5/30/2023; Dispositive motions due by 2/1/2024; Settlement Demand due by 11/15/2023; Response to Settlement Demand due by 11/30/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/22/2023. (kk2)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Schill, Alexandra)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint,, filed by All Defendants. (Schill, Alexandra)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rupa Baskaran. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/3/2023. (er)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donald J. Munro. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/3/2023. (er)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2023 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GenuineQs website as of May 1 2023, #2 Exhibit B - 2014 and 2015 NJASAP Communications, #3 Exhibit C - 2023 NJASAP Communications, #4 Exhibit D - March 8 email, #5 Exhibit E - Chapter 3 Crewmember Policy Manual, #6 Exhibit F - Union request for clarification re GenuineQs prohibition, #7 Exhibit G - Email from Gallagher re picketing) (Petroff, D.)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots re #1 Complaint,, Civil Cover Sheet (Petroff, D.)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9389923) of Rupa Baskaran by Plaintiff NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Petroff, D.)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number BOHSDC-9389812) of Donald J. Munro by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Schill, Alexandra)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants NetJets, Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for NetJets, Inc... (Schill, Alexandra)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets Inc., Berkshire Hathaway Inc. identifying Other Affiliate NetJets Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for NetJets Aviation, Inc... (Schill, Alexandra)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Lehman Schill for Defendants NetJets Aviation, Inc., NetJets, Inc. (Schill, Alexandra)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/25/2023. (sln)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9382552), filed by NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GenuineQs website, #2 Exhibit B - 2014 and 2015 NJASAP Communications, #3 Exhibit C- 2023 NJASAP Communications, #4 Exhibit D- March 8 email, #5 Exhibit E - Chapter 3 Crewmember Policy Manual, #6 Exhibit F - Union request for clarification re GenuineQs prohibition, #7 Exhibit G- Email from Gallagher re picketing) (Petroff, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots v. NetJets Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetJets Association of Shared Aircraft Pilots
Represented By: D. James Petroff
Represented By: Rupa Baskaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Represented By: Alexandra Lehman Schill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Lehman Schill
Represented By: Donald J. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?