Newtyn Partners, LP et al v. Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Newtyn Partners, LP and Newtyn TE Partners, LP
Defendant: Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Charles J. Horn, John J. Chesnut and Ralph J. Andretta
Case Number: 2:2023cv01451
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notation ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lester Hooker, Maya Saxena, and Jonathan Lamet on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/19/2023. (sln)
September 7, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. . (Attachments: #1 Amended Certificate of Good Standing - Saxena, #2 Amended Certificate of Good Standing - Lamet) (Camillus, John)
August 25, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Deficiency re: The submitted certificate is not from the highest court of a State. Related Document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9568781) of Lester R. Hooker, Maya Saxena, and Jonathan Lamet filed by Newtyn TE Partners, LP & Newtyn Partners, LP. Deficiency Deadline by 9/8/2023. (er)
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9568781) of Lester R. Hooker, Maya Saxena, and Jonathan Lamet by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing - Hooker, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing - Saxena, #3 Exhibit certificate of good standing - Lamet) (Camillus, John)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP of Unopposed Motion (Camillus, John)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Parties' Joint Motion For Extension of Time Regarding Case Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/26/2023. (mas)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles S. Duggan and Benjamin S. Kaminetzky. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/26/2023. (mas)
July 25, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9523303) of Benjamin S. Kaminetzky by Defendants Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Ralph J. Andretta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate in Good Standing) (Guttman, Daniel)
July 25, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9523301) of Charles S. Duggan by Defendants Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Ralph J. Andretta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Guttman, Daniel)
July 25, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/14/2023. by Defendants Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Ralph J. Andretta. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT, #2 Text of Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE) (Guttman, Daniel)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to John J. Chesnut on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023; Charles J. Horn on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver - C. Horn) (Camillus, John)
July 20, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on ALLIANCE DATA SYSTEMS CORPORATION N/K/A BREAD FINANCIAL HOLDINGS, INC. on 07/18/23, filed by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. (Camillus, John)
July 20, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ralph J. Andretta on 6/1/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (Camillus, John)
July 12, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc., Ralph J. Andretta, John J. Chesnut & Charles J. Horn. (er)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice of David J. Schwartz as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/12/2023. (daf)
July 11, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9502758) of David Schwartz by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing) (Camillus, John)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Plaintiffs Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Camillus, John)
May 2, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Camillus, John)
April 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (daf)
April 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9389137), filed by Newtyn Partners, LP, Newtyn TE Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure) (Camillus, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newtyn Partners, LP et al v. Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtyn Partners, LP
Represented By: John C Camillus
Represented By: Jonathan Lamet
Represented By: David J. Schwartz
Represented By: Lester R Hooker
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtyn TE Partners, LP
Represented By: John C Camillus
Represented By: Jonathan Lamet
Represented By: David J. Schwartz
Represented By: Lester R Hooker
Represented By: Maya Saxena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Data Systems Corporation N/K/A Bread Financial Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S Duggan
Represented By: Daniel Jay Guttman
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles J. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Chesnut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph J. Andretta
Represented By: Daniel Jay Guttman
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Charles S Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?