AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. v. John et al
Plaintiff: AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. doing business as AGC Automotive Americas Co.
Defendant: Mwita John, Geofrey Mgaya, Jema Machines Automation, LLC, Tanzex Automation & Design, LLC and Samuel A. Oduro doing business as dba Sams Tax Preparation
Case Number: 2:2023cv01980
Filed: June 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Levying Officer of Attachment executed on 7/27/2023. (mas)
August 15, 2023 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by USMS per #12 Order. (mas)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that the Court will not re-send ECF No. 12 or pay the recording fee, but Plaintiff may. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/10/2023. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint as to Geofrey Mgaya. Answer due 9/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/8/2023. (EPD)
August 7, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. New date requested 9/25/2023 by Defendant Geofrey Mgaya. (mas)
August 4, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Samuel A. Oduro served on 8/2/2023, answer due 8/23/2023. (er)
July 28, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the Praecipe for Service, Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment Without Notice or Hearing, Order of Attachment, Notice that an order of attachment was issued and that the defendant has right to a hearing on the matter, complaint and issued summons was sent via certified mail to the defendants. (mas)
July 27, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #12 Order Praecipe for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment, #2 Exhibit B. Order, #3 Exhibit C. Notice to JEMA Machines Automation, LLC, #4 Exhibit D. JEMA Machines Automation, LLC's Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit E. Complaint, #6 Exhibit F. JEMA Machines Automation, LLC Summons) (Lydon, Angela)
July 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #12 Order Praecipe for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment, #2 Exhibit B. Order, #3 Exhibit C. Notice to Tanzex Automation & Design LLC, #4 Exhibit D. Tanzex Automation & Design, LLC's Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit E. Complaint, #6 Exhibit F. Tanzex Automation & Design, LLC Summons) (Lydon, Angela)
July 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #12 Order Praecipe for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment, #2 Exhibit B. Order, #3 Exhibit C. Notice to Samuel A. Oduro, #4 Exhibit D. Samuel A. Oduro's Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit E. Complaint, #6 Exhibit F. Samuel A. Oduro Summons) (Lydon, Angela)
July 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #12 Order Praecipe for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Mgaya Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment Without Notice or Hearing, #2 Exhibit B. Mgaya Order, #3 Exhibit C. Notice to Geofrey Mgaya, #4 Exhibit D. Geofrey Mgaya's Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit E. Complaint, #6 Exhibit F. Geofrey Mgaya Summons) (Lydon, Angela)
July 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #12 Order Praecipe for Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment Without Notice or Hearing, #2 Exhibit B. Order, #3 Exhibit C. Notice to Mwita John, #4 Exhibit D. Mwita John's Request for Hearing, #5 Exhibit E. Complaint, #6 Exhibit F. Mwita John Summons) (Lydon, Angela)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/11/2023. (jk)
July 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Filing of Attachment Bond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. ATTACHMENT BOND) (Lydon, Angela)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment Without Notice or Hearing. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a bond with the Court in the amount of $2,384,462.22 and, WITHIN FIVE DAYS of filing the bond, submit a proposed order of attachment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on July 5, 2023. (jlk)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jema Machines Automation, LLC, Mwita John, Geofrey Mgaya, Samuel A. Oduro & Tanzex Automation & Design, LLC. (er)
June 20, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc.. (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Attachment Without Notice or Hearing by Plaintiff AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Application and Motion for Order of Prejudgment Interest Without Notice or Hearing, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Affidavit of Daniel Harmon, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Affidavit of Robert Levine) (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Defendant Samuel A. Oduro (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Defendant Tanzex Automation & Design LLC (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Defendant JEMA Machines Automation, LLC (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Defendant Geofrey Mgaya (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Defendant Mwita John (Lydon, Angela)
June 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9474506), filed by AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Orders List) (Lydon, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. v. John et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. doing business as AGC Automotive Americas Co.
Represented By: Angela D. Lydon
Represented By: Christopher G. Keim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mwita John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geofrey Mgaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jema Machines Automation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanzex Automation & Design, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Oduro doing business as dba Sams Tax Preparation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?