In re Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. Data Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Kevin Gruscinski
Defendant: Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv02070
Filed: June 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Consolidated Plaintiffs against Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc., filed by Kevin Gruscinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Example of Breach Notice, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff Coffey's Breach Notice) (Gould, Dylan)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting (26) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:23-cv-02070-MHW-EPD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/20/2023. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02070-MHW-EPD, 2:23-cv-02424-MHW-EPD. (vb)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Proposed Pretrial Order Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02070-MHW-EPD, 2:23-cv-02424-MHW-EPD (Krzeski, Philip) Modified on 10/20/2023 (vb).
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Proposed Case Schedule. Plaintiffs will file a Consolidated Amended Class Complaint no later than October 23, 2023; and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant will answer or otherwise plead with respect to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than December 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 22, 2023. (jlk)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. answer due 12/7/2023. (jlk)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR PROPOSED CASE SCHEDULE by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02070-MHW-EPD, 2:23-cv-02424-MHW-EPD (Krzeski, Philip) Modified for statistical purposes on 9/22/2023 (jlk).
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HEARING TIME: Status Conference reset for 9/15/2023 01:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (Previously set for 3:00 PM.) (sln)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE : The Status Conference set for 9/15/2023 is VACATED. Counsel to file a schedule for the consolidated amended complaint and related response by 9/22/2023. (sln)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION and ORDER granting #17 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting #22 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Raina C. Borrelli for Kevin Gruscinski. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 9/14/2023. (jk)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Turke & Strauss Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit Chestnut Cambronne Firm Resume) (Coates, Terence)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Raina C. Borelli as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/1/2023. (mas)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski re #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9580719) of Raina C. Borrelli Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Minnesota (Coates, Terence)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Deficiency re: The motion does not contain certificate of good standing. Related Document: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9580719) of Raina C. Borrelli filed by Kevin Gruscinski. Deficiency Deadline by 9/15/2023. (mas)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9580719) of Raina C. Borrelli by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. (Coates, Terence)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. (Coates, Terence)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski. (Coates, Terence)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/12/2023 03:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. answer due 9/21/2023. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference, currently scheduled for August 22, 2023, is VACATED and will be reset by separate notice at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 17, 2023. (jlk)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 9/21/2023. by Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.. (Dettmer Slye, Carrie)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Casie D. Collignon. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/8/2023. (er)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9544481) of Casie D. Collignon by Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Brumfield, Jennifer)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.. (Dettmer Slye, Carrie)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Brumfield for Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. (Brumfield, Jennifer)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Vacated per Order #14 . NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2023 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) Modified on 8/17/2023 (jlk).
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #1 Complaint as to Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. Answer due 8/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/18/2023. (EPD)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 8/21/2023. by Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.. (Dettmer Slye, Carrie)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.. (er)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. as to Defendant Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. (Coates, Terence)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kevin Gruscinski re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Coates, Terence)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9484596), filed by Kevin Gruscinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Breach Notice) (Coates, Terence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc. Data Breach Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gruscinski
Represented By: Terence Richard Coates
Represented By: Dylan James Gould
Represented By: Raina C. Borrelli
Represented By: Philip J. Krzeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasserstrom Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Brumfield
Represented By: Carrie Dettmer Slye
Represented By: Casie D. Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?