Whitacre v. Forshey
Plaintiff: Carl E Whitacre
Defendant: Warden Jay Forshey
Case Number: 2:2023cv03435
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEFICIENCY ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay $402 ($350 filing fee plus $52 administrative fee) or submit to the Court a completed Application and Affidavit By Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees form within thirty (30) days. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to sign the complaint and return it to the Clerk of Court within thirty (30) days if he wishes to proceed with this action. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court shall dismiss this case for want of prosecution. Any motions for extension of time must be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this Deficiency Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/11/2023. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (RETURN TO SENDER - UNABLE TO FORWARD) Mail sent to Carl E. Whitacre as to re #2 Notice of Deficiency (Prisoner Case) and #1 Complaint. (er)
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Deficiency: The Court's docket reflects the initiation of the above referenced civil action. The initiating material contains the following deficiency(ies):Filing Fee Missing. The materials do not include the filing fee ($402) or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (provided).Issue With Complaint/Petition. The complaint/petition is not signed. (Attachments: #1 In forma pauperis- prisoner) (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carl E Whitacre against Jay Forshey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitacre v. Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E Whitacre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jay Forshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?