Fields v. Wilhite et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Fields
Defendant: Detective Wilhite, Detective Moore, Parole Officer Gaumer, Muskingham County Board of Commissioners, Parole Officer Nutter, Ron Welch and Matt Lutz
Case Number: 2:2023cv03755
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/Petitioner's Memorandum Showing Cause Why His Complaint is Not Time Barred by Plaintiff Gerald Fields. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mas) Modified text on 12/27/2023 (mas).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court further ORDERS to show cause, in writing, and within 30 days, why his Complaint is not subject to dismissal on the ground that it is time-barred. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff is further required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prison account until he pays the full amount of the filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The custodian is ORDERED to complete and to submit to the Clerk of Court in Columbus, Ohio the attached form showing his calculation of the initial partial filing fee. Show Cause Response due by 12/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/28/2023. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification).
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gerald Fields. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 USM Forms, #3 Envelope) (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Wilhite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Wilhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole Officer Gaumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muskingham County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole Officer Nutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?