Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Folmar & Son, LLC
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Defendant: Folmar & Son, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv03772
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Folmar & Son, LLC. Folmar & Son, LLC served on 12/29/2023, answer due 1/19/2024. (Hymore, Ryan)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons and Complaint sent by certified mail to Folmar & Son, LLC (kk2)
November 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Folmar & Son, LLC. (mas)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Folmar & Son, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9683744), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Hymore, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Folmar & Son, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Represented By: Ryan Keith Hymore
Represented By: Austin Tyler Opalich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folmar & Son, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?