McGill et al v. Xponential Fitness LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannon McGill, Gina Oliveira, Justin Curry, Laurel Brennan, Melissa Fernandez, Caitlin Kirkpatrick, Adrienne Hilton, Delaney McConnell, Shannon Coleman, Lauren Bell, Kristin Ruyter, Kathryn Crowley, Taylor Edwards-Moody, Margaret Dickey, Julie Cercello, Katie Carey, Adina Murrell, Natalie Eggleston, Madison Weinert, Amy Thureen, Christina Scott, Stacey Karelas, Amy Hase, Lisa Smith, Bond Bourquein, Marissa Vitulli, Jill Lounsbery and Darley Twiddy
Defendant: Xponential Fitness LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, AKT Franchise, LLC, AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Stride Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC, MD Pro Fitness, LLC and Mitch Brown
Case Number: 2:2023cv03909
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Unclaimed. Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Mitch Brown as to re #4 Certificate of Mailing by Clerk. (mas)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Yoga Six Franchise, LLC. (mas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant AKT Franchise, LLC. AKT Franchise, LLC served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (mas)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting re #12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. AKT Franchise SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; AKT Franchise, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Cyclebar Franchising, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; PB Franchising SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; PB Franchising, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Row House Franchise SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Row House Franchise, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Stride Franchise SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Stride Franchise, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; XPOF Assetco, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Xponential Fitness LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC answer due 4/24/2024; Yoga Six Franchise, LLC answer due 4/24/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/27/2023. (mas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, New date requested 4/24/2024. and Stipulation with Proposed Order by Defendants AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, AKT Franchise, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, Stride Franchise, LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, Xponential Fitness LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise, LLC. (Martin, Ryan)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Spital and Jill K. Grant as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/19/2023. (mas)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, AKT Franchise, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, Stride Franchise, LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, Xponential Fitness LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise, LLC, Xponential Fitness, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Xponential Fitness, Inc. for Xponential Fitness LLC.. (Martin, Ryan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9736978) of Andrew Spital; Jill K. Grant by Defendants AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, AKT Franchise, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, Stride Franchise, LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, Xponential Fitness LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew Spital, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jill Grant) (Martin, Ryan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant MD Pro Fitness, LLC. MD Pro Fitness, LLC served on 12/7/2023, answer due 12/28/2023. (mas)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Stride Franchise, LLC. Stride Franchise, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (mas)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, Xponential Fitness LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC. AKT Franchise SPV, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; PB Franchising SPV, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; PB Franchising, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Row House Franchise SPV, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Row House Franchise, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Stride Franchise SPV, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; XPOF Assetco, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Xponential Fitness LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023; Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (mas)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Cyclebar Franchising, LLC. Cyclebar Franchising, LLC served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (mas)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Mailing by Clerk - Copy of Complaint and Issued Summons was sent to the named defendants via Certified Mail. (mve)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AKT Franchise SPV, LLC, AKT Franchise, LLC, Mitch Brown, Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC, Cyclebar Franchising, LLC, MD Pro Fitness, LLC, PB Franchising SPV, LLC, PB Franchising, LLC, Row House Franchise SPV, LLC, Row House Franchise, LLC, Stride Franchise SPV, LLC, Stride Franchise, LLC, XPOF Assetco, LLC, Xponential Fitness LLC, Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC, Yoga Six Franchise, LLC. (mas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form, #9 Summons Form, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form, #12 Summons Form, #13 Summons Form, #14 Summons Form, #15 Summons Form) (Starling, Jason)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9701050), filed by Christina Scott, Adrienne Hilton, Marissa Vitulli, Gina Oliveira, Adina Murrell, Shannon McGill, Natalie Eggleston, Katie Carey, Jill Lounsbery, Bond Bourquein, Darley Twiddy, Amy Thureen, Margaret Dickey, Lisa Smith, Lauren Bell, Kristin Ruyter, Stacey Karelas, Taylor Edwards-Moody, Amy Hase, Caitlin Kirkpatrick, Justin Curry, Shannon Coleman, Kathryn Crowley, Julie Cercello, Delaney McConnell, Laurel Brennan, Madison Weinert, Melissa Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Starling, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill et al v. Xponential Fitness LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon McGill
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Oliveira
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Curry
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurel Brennan
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Fernandez
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Hilton
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaney McConnell
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Coleman
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Bell
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Ruyter
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Crowley
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Edwards-Moody
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Dickey
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Cercello
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Carey
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adina Murrell
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Eggleston
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Weinert
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Thureen
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Scott
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Karelas
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hase
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bond Bourquein
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Vitulli
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Lounsbery
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darley Twiddy
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xponential Fitness LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPOF Assetco, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKT Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKT Franchise SPV, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyclebar Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyclebar Franchising SPV, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PB Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PB Franchising SPV, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Row House Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Row House Franchise SPV, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stride Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stride Franchise SPV, LLC
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoga Six Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yoga Six Franchise SPV, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Michael Martin
Represented By: Jill Kaden Grant
Represented By: Andrew Spital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Pro Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?