Nurein v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Mohamed Nurein
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Case Number: 2:2023cv03936
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Michael R Merz
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notation ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to answer the Petition to and including February 9, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 01/26/2024. (MRM)
January 26, 2024 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/9/2024. to show cause why the petition for writ of habeas corpus should not be granted. by Respondent Warden, Noble Correctional Institution. (Fosnaught, Jerri)
January 26, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution answer to the petition due by 2/9/2024. (sem)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 11/29/23. (pb) The Clerk is directed to serve the Petition on Respondent and the Attorney General of Ohio) Habeas Corpus Unit of the Corrections Litigation Section(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 29, 2023 Filing fee (Habeas Corpus): $ 5.00, receipt number 200004797 (kk2)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mohamed Nurein. (Attachments: #1 Additional Statement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nurein v. Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mohamed Nurein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Noble Correctional Institution
Represented By: Jerri Lynne Fosnaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?