Hester v. Davies et al
Plaintiff: Clarence O Hester
Defendant: Albert E Davies, III, Corey N Alexander, Amy L Busic, Rhonda L Greenwood and Belmont County Job & Family
Case Number: 2:2023cv04034
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Clarence O Hester (kk2)
December 14, 2023 Filing 4 This entry is for statistical purposes only. (mas)
December 14, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint filed by Clarence O Hester. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/14/2023. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 14, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Corey N Alexander, Belmont County Job & Family, Amy L Busic, Albert E Davies, III, Rhonda L Greenwood, filed by Clarence O Hester. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibits Part 2) (mas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Clarence O Hester. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Complaint Ex. A, #4 Complaint Ex. B, #5 Complaint Ex. C, #6 Complaint Ex. D, #7 Complaint Ex. E, #8 Complaint Ex. F, #9 Complaint Ex. G, #10 Summons Form, #11 USM Form) (mve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hester v. Davies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence O Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert E Davies, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey N Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L Busic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda L Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont County Job & Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?