Allen v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: John Dale Allen
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, IRS Commissioner and Jonathan M. Morris
Case Number: 2:2024cv00315
Filed: January 25, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff John Dale Allen (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION- re #2 Complaint filed by John Dale Allen. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against the United States, the IRS, and Mr. Morris in his official capacity for failure to assert a claim over which this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction, and it is further RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's individual-capacity claim against Mr. Morris for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/30/2024. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
January 30, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against IRS Commissioner, Jonathan M. Morris, United States of America, filed by John Dale Allen. (mas)
January 30, 2024 This entry is for statistical purposes only. (mas)
January 25, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Dale Allen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dale Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?