Fisher v. Kissee et al
Plaintiff: Jaylen Fisher
Defendant: Officer Grady Kissee, City of Columbus, Columbus Police Department and Chief of Police Elaine Bryant
Case Number: 2:2024cv00906
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jaylen Fisher. (Shroyer, David)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties and Motions to Amend due by 8/30/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 5/10/2024. Discovery due by 2/28/2025. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on any matter related to discovery, they are directed to arrange a conference with the Court. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2025. Primary Expert due by 10/11/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/22/2024. Settlement Demand due by 7/26/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 8/30/2024. Mediation Deadline: 8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/22/2024. (mas) Modified by correcting judge on 4/22/2024 (mas).
April 17, 2024 NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2024 10:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #11 .) (sln)
April 16, 2024 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Elaine Bryant, City of Columbus, Columbus Police Department, Grady Kissee. (Rabe, Lee Ann)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Dirisamer for Defendants Elaine Bryant, City of Columbus, Columbus Police Department, Grady Kissee (Dirisamer, David)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2024 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Elaine Bryant, City of Columbus, Columbus Police Department, Grady Kissee. (Rabe, Lee Ann)
March 25, 2024 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Waiver of Service Executed sent to City of Columbus. (er)
March 22, 2024 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to Defendants: Elaine Bryant, Columbus Police Department, and Grady Kissee. Signed waivers - answer date 5/6/24. (mve) Modified answer due date on 3/26/2024- There was not a change in the answer due dates, see waiver entries #2 , #3 , #4 & #5 (er).
March 18, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Grady Kissee on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Shroyer, David)
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Columbus Police Department on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Shroyer, David)
March 18, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to City of Columbus on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Shroyer, David)
March 18, 2024 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Elaine Bryant on 3/7/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (Shroyer, David)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9840272), filed by Jaylen Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shroyer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Kissee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaylen Fisher
Represented By: David I Shroyer
Represented By: Tyler Brown Shroyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Grady Kissee
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Police Department
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Elaine Bryant
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?