Healy v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Healy
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 2:2024cv01028
Filed: March 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - Within FOURTEEN DAYS, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint notice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/7/2024. Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-01026-MHW-EPD, 2:24-cv-01027-MHW-EPD, 2:24-cv-01028-MHW-EPD, 2:24-cv-01029-MHW-EPD, 2:24-cv-01030-MHW-EPD (jk)
March 4, 2024 Filing 76 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00226. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 1, 2024 Lead case and all member cases transferred to the Southern District of Ohio, per docket 211 in 3:20-cv-06009-JD.3:20-cv-05296-JD Green et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al3:22-cv-00226-JD Healy v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al3:22-cv-00227-JD Urista v. Wells Fargo & Company et al3:22-cv-02890-JD Forsburg v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2024) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
August 20, 2022 Filing 75 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/18/22, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Balll, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (153 in 3:20-cv-06009-JD) Transcript Order, (154 in 3:20-cv-06009-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2022. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/20/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/19/2022. (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 17, 2022 Filing 73 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hartman, Jared) (Filed on 2/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 15, 2022 Filing 72 Case Reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/14/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 14, 2022 Filing 70 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 7, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE by Patrick Healy of Pending Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Declaration of counsel, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hartman, Jared) (Filed on 2/7/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 4, 2022 Filing 68 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2022, 01:00 PM, via Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: b> Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, February 17, 2022, by 10:00 AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (Th is is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on February 4, 2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 65 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (Filed on 2/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 64 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 18, 2022 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 62 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 14, 2022 Filing 61 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01838. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 11, 2022 Filing 60 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of California*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue, Box 36060**San Francisco, CA 94102-3489*. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jms) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 1/11/2022. (jms) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER Extending Deadline to Raise Discovery Dispute with the Court. The parties have jointly requested an extension of time until 1/30/22 for Defendant (1) to review Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, which Plaintiff shall provide by 1/10/22; and (2) to seek Court intervention in any discovery disputes that may remain after Defendant's review of the Supplemental Responses and additional meet-and-confer efforts thereafter. The Court hereby GRANTS the joint request and extends Defendant's deadline to seek Court intervention regarding Plaintiff's Supplemental Responses to 1/30/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/20/21.(no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 16, 2021 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 11/16/2021. The Court gave its tentative thoughts on whether it would be inclined to grant a motion to stay discovery pending resolution of the motion to transfer the case to the Northern District of California. The Court set a deadline of 11/30/2021 for Plaintiff's counsel to contact Judge Goddard's chambers for a hearing date on a motion to stay discovery. (Plaintiff Attorney Jared Hartman). (Defendant Attorneys Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan, Amy Williams, William Mayberry, and Jessica Lohr). (no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/12/2021.(dxf) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Support re #49 MOTION for Order to transfer case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Hartman, Jared) (dxf). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
October 18, 2021 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Order to transfer case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kalama M. Lui-Kwan, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (dxf). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/4/2021. The Court submits the #49 MOTION for Order to transfer case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California and vacates the hearing on the motion set for 11/1/2021. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Jared M. Hartman; Babak Semnar). (Defendant Attorney Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan; William C. Mayberry; Amy Pritchard Williams). (no document attached) (smy) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 52 PRO HAC APPROVED: Amy Pritchard Williams appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (no document attached) (rmc) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 51 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Williams, Amy) (rmc). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 14, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2021 is vacated and rescheduled for 10/4/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (no document attached) (smy) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for Order to transfer case to U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of counsel, #2 Proof of Service)(Hartman, Jared) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Continuing Status Conference. Status Conference reset for 9/20/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/2/2021.(jmr) Modified on 8/3/2021 to correct docket text to reflect correct date of the hearing (smy). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 47 STATUS REPORT Regarding Parties' Request to Stay Proceeding Pending Ongoing Mediation Efforts by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
July 2, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Patrick Healy of case(s) 2:21-cv-00112-JCC . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hartman, Jared) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Minute ORDER: In light of the withdrawal of Plaintiff's motion to change venue (See Doc. No. 44), the joint motion to continue the hearing on the motion to change venue (Doc. No. #42 ) is moot. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 5/4/2021. (no document attached) (smy) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
May 3, 2021 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn L. Huff: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/3/2021. MOTION to Change Venue to Northern District of California #19 filed by Plaintiff Patrick Healy is withdrawn without prejudice to refiling. A Status Hearing is set for 8/16/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. (Court Reporter/ECR Lynnette Lawrence). (Plaintiff Attorney Jared M. Hartman). (Defendant Attorney Andrew D. Atkins; Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr; William C. Mayberry; Amy Williams). (no document attached) (smy) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Minute ORDER: On April 27, 2021, the parties filed a joint motion to continue the hearing on Plaintiff's pending motion to transfer. (Doc. No. #42 .) A similar motion was filed in a related case pending before the Court, Urista v. Wells Fargo & Company et al, Case No. 3:20-cv-1689-H-AHG. The Court sets a telephonic joint status conference to discuss the pending motions in this case and in Urista for Monday, May 3, 2021 at 1:45 pm. The Court will e-mail counsel the dial-in information prior to the hearing. The parties need not file any responsive briefing to Plaintiff's pending motion to transfer, (Doc. No. #19 ), before the May 3, 2021, status conference. The Court will discuss an updated briefing schedule at the status conference. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/28/2021. (no document attached) (smy) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 27, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Proceedings to U.S. District Court for Northern District of California by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica)(jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 4/23/2021. (jmr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 40 Joint MOTION For Entry of Protective Order by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) QC Mailer, re: wrong event (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Yana A. Hart terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/12/2021. (mme) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Yana Hart by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF YANA A. HART IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD, #2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Hart, Yana) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF WITHDRAW OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD by Patrick Healy (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Hart, Yana) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 36 *** Withdrawn per #37 *** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Yana Hart by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF YANA A. HART IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD, #2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Hart, Yana)Attorney Yana A. Hart added to party Patrick Healy(pty:pla) *QC Mailer sent - wrong plaintiff listed in document*(mme). 4 [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Continuing Hearing. Motion Hearing re #19 reset for 5/17/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/17/2021.(jmr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
March 16, 2021 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/12/2021. If the parties have not filed their contemplated joint motion by 3/17/2021, the Court will schedule another teleconference. (Plaintiff Attorney in Healy case: Babak Semnar). (Plaintiff Attorney in Urista case: Ahren A. Tiller). (Plaintiff Attorneys in related N.D. Cal. case: Abbas Kazerounian and Derek Loeser). (Plaintiff Attorney in related W.D. Va. case: Theodore Bartholow). (Defendant Attorneys: Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan, Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr, William C. Mayberry, Andrew D. Atkins, and Amy Williams). (no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
March 10, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/10/2021. The parties are expected to continue meeting and conferring, and will update the Court as to their progress at the upcoming follow-up telephonic Status Conference set for 3/12/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (Plaintiff Attorney in Healy case: Babak Semnar). (Plaintiff Attorney in Urista case: Ahren A. Tiller). (Plaintiff Attorneys in related N.D. Cal. case: Abbas Kazerounian and Derek Loeser). (Plaintiff Attorney in related W.D. Va. case: Theodore Bartholow). (Defendant Attorneys: Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan, Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr, William C. Mayberry, Andrew D. Atkins, and Amy Williams). (no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER Resetting Case Management Conference ("CMC"). Time Change Only. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the telephonic CMC originally scheduled for 3/12/2021 at 2:00 PM is RESET for the same day at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. See ECF No. #22 for call-in instructions to attend the CMC. The Status Conference scheduled for 3/10/2021 remains in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/9/21.(no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Setting Status Conference. Status Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/12/2021.(jmr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 29 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew D. Atkins appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (no document attached) (jrd) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 28 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $206.00 receipt number ACASDC-15360353.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Atkins, Andrew)(jrd) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Joint Motion to Continue Motion Hearing reset for 3/29/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/9/2021. (jmr) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Change Venue to Northern District of California filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 9, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . (Lohr, Jessica) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 24 *** Withdrawn per #25 *** RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Change Venue to Northern District of California filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica)QC Mailer, incorrect signature(jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Proceeding to U.S. District Court for Northern District of California by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) QC Mailer ,incorrect caption (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Continuing Case Management Conference Case Management Conference reset for 3/12/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/3/2021.(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 1/28/2021. The case did not settle. The Court will reset the Case Management Conference at a later date.(Plaintiff Attorney Jared Hartman). (Defendant Attorneys Jessica Lohr, William Mayberry, and Kalama Lui-Kwan). (no document attached) (kxm) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Patrick Healy re #17 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference (Hartman, Jared) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Change Venue to Northern District of California by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of counsel, #2 Proof of Service)(Hartman, Jared) (jmr). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15124516.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, Amy) QC mail sent re missing signature on 12/29/2020, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via videoconference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/28/2021 at 2:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/04/2020.(jpp) (dlg) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #8 Defendant's Motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 12/03/2020. (jpp) (dlg). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY - Other re #8 MOTION to Change Venue (Motion to Transfer Proceeding) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) (jpp). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Change Venue (Motion to Transfer Proceeding) filed by Patrick Healy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hartman, Jared) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 PRO HAC APPROVED: William C. Mayberry appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (no document attached) (rmc) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14866566.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mayberry, William) (rmc). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER vacating Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Manage Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/10/2020.(jpp) (dlg). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:20-cv-01689-H-AHG. The new case number is 20cv1838-H-AHG.. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 111/6/2020.(anh) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of case(s) USDC CASD Case No. 3:20-cv-01689-H-AHG; USDC CAND 3:20-cv-05296-JD; USDC CAND 3:20-cv-06009-JD;USBC VAWD Case No. 7:20-ap-7028, Case No. 7:17-bk-71487; USDC VAWD 5:20-cv-00046-MFU . (Lui-Kwan, Kalama) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue (Motion to Transfer Proceeding) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Info Sheet Exhibit Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Lui-Kwan, Kalama)Attorney Kalama Mark Lui-Kwan added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conferenceand Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/23/2020.(anh) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Lohr, Jessica) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Babak Semnar on behalf of Patrick Healy (Semnar, Babak)Attorney Babak Semnar added to party Patrick Healy(pty:pla) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #3 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/21/2020. (anh) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Lohr, Jessica) (anh). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00028238- CU-MC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14530867.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1838-CAB-MSB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). [Transferred from California Northern on 3/4/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healy v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Healy
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Represented By: Jared Michael Hartman
Represented By: Babak Semnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ellis Lohr
Represented By: William C. Mayberry
Represented By: Andrew D. Atkins
Represented By: Amy Pritchard Williams
Represented By: Kalama M. Lui-Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?