Eckstein v. Franklin County Corrections II et al.
Plaintiff: Andrew J Eckstein
Defendant: Franklin County Corrections II, Armor Health, Dallas Baldwin, Unknown Deputies, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown 1st Shift Deputies, Unknown 2nd Shift Deputies and Unknown Arraignment Deputies
Case Number: 2:2024cv01072
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #9 Amended Complaint filed by Andrew J Eckstein: The Undersigned will PERMIT Plaintiff's claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need to PROCEED to further development. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim because the allegations do not state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a completed US Marshal Form and Summons Form for Dallas Baldwin w/in twenty-one (21) days. Once received, the United States Marshal Service is DIRECTED to serve a copy of the Summons, Amended Complaint, and this Order on Sheriff Baldwin. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Franklin County Corrections II and Armor Health as parties on the docket, as they are not named as defendants in the Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall designate Sheriff Baldwin as an interested party, rather than a defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Motion to Issue Service once he discovers the identities of the unknown defendants. The Motion must attach a completed US Marshal Form and Summons Form for each defendant to be served. Plaintiff is ADVISED that no service will be issued on the unknown defendants unless he complies with this Order. Objections to R&R due by 5/16/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 5/2/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Unknown Deputies, Unknown Medical Staff, Unknown Arraignment Deputies, filed by Andrew J Eckstein. (vb)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's Application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 , #5 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED at this time but may be renewed; Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (Doc. 1-2, PageID 9) is DENIED as moot; NO ACTION will be taken at this time on the service documents or subpoenas (Doc. 1-3, PageID 9-10; Doc. 1-4, PageID 12; Doc. 1-5, PageID 13-31); Plaintiff shall submit an Amended Complaint within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/20/2024. (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-02233. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 6, 2024 Filing 6 Transfer Case (District). Given the operative allegations, the Court determines that justice favors transferring this action to the Southern District of Ohio pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Therefore, the court hereby transfers said action to the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/6/2024. (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
March 6, 2024 Copy of #6 Transfer Case (District) mailed to Andrew James Eckstein, A699576, Lorain Correctional Institution, 2075 South Avon-Belden Road Grafton, OH 44044 on 3/6/2024. Related document(s) #6 . (R,Sh) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 Supplement to #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Andrew James Eckstein. Related document(s) #2 , #4 . (Attachments: #1 FFF Court Certification, #2 Affidavit of Indigency, #3 Inmate Demand Statement, #4 Envelope) (R,AP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2024: #5 Affidavit of Prisoner) (E,P). [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Pro se plaintiff Andrew James Eckstein has filed a motion to proceed with this action without prepayment of fees (ECF Doc. #2 ). Because Plaintiff is a prisoner in a correctional institution, he must pay the filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). If Plaintiff does not have sufficient funds in his account to pay the full filing fee at once, he shall complete and submit the entire Financial Application attached hereto, including a certified copy of his prisoner account statement, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 1/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Financial Application). (D,JJ) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
January 11, 2024 Copy of #4 Order, mailed to Andrew James Eckstein #A699576 at Lorain Correctional Institution, 2075 South Avon-Belden Road, Grafton, OH 44044 on 1/11/2024. (D,JJ) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 Motion for appointment of legal counsel representation filed by Plaintiff Andrew James Eckstein. (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Andrew James Eckstein. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Prisoner). (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Andrew James Eckstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Letter to Clerk regarding submission of evidence, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 USM-285, #5 Various Subpoenas to Produce Documents, #6 Envelope). (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]
November 17, 2023 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (H,Ch) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 3/6/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckstein v. Franklin County Corrections II et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Corrections II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown 1st Shift Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown 2nd Shift Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Arraignment Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?