Michael v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Heather Michael
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2024cv01108
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Peter B Silvain
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Filing 7 First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 6/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 002 Court Transcript Index, #2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 006 Non Disability Related Development, #6 007 Disability Related Development, #7 008 Medical Records Part 1, #8 009 Medical Records Part 2, #9 010 Medical Records Part 3, #10 011 Medical Records Part 4, #11 012 Medical Records Part 5) (Stark, John)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Heather Michael. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In accordance with the Southern District of Ohio Civil Rule 8.1, the Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within sixty (60) days after filing of the Social Security Identification Form, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Errors within forty-five (45) days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen (15) days after the memorandum in opposition is filed. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. All documents filed electronically must be filed in optical character recognition (OCR) text-searchable PDF format. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 03/11/2024. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Jurisdiction Form shall be completed and emailed to the Court's Social Security Case Coordinator at, SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov or mailed to: Office of the ClerkWalter H. Rice Federal Buildingand U.S. CourthouseRoom 712Attn: Social Security Coordinator200 W. Second StreetDayton, Ohio 45402DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE THIS DOCUMENT, IT MUST BE MAILED TO THE ABOVE ADDRESS OR EMAILED TO SSA_Coordinator@ohsd.uscourts.gov. The completed Statement As To Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form due by 4/10/2024 (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE and GENERAL ORDER 22-04: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, if no party indicates that they are withholding their consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will remain with the assigned Magistrate Judge for all matters, including entry of a final judgment. Further, the filing of a party's statement of errors or memorandum in opposition without first filing an executed copy of the Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form will also be deemed as consent by that party to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction over all aspects of the litigation, including entry of a final judgment. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. added. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security shall file the electronic certified administrative record and answer or respond to the Complaint by 5/10/2024. (jmb)
March 11, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to #S.D. Ohio General Order 22-04, there is no unanimous consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to randomly assign this case to a resident District Judge. (jmb)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Heather Michael. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 SS ID Form) (Buckley, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Michael
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?