Simmons v. City of Columbus et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Simmons
Defendant: City of Columbus, Chase W. Rogers and Randall C. Beam
Case Number: 2:2024cv01550
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Nicole Pickerill for Defendants Randall C. Beam, City of Columbus, Chase W. Rogers (Pickerill, Alexandra)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Westley Matthew Phillips for Defendants Randall C. Beam, City of Columbus, Chase W. Rogers (Phillips, Westley)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Feldkamp for Defendants Randall C. Beam, City of Columbus, Chase W. Rogers (Feldkamp, Sarah)
May 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2024 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
May 24, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Randall C. Beam, City of Columbus, Chase W. Rogers. (Rabe, Lee Ann)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. Answer due 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 WOS, #2 WOS) (Rettig, Madeline) Modified text to include answer due date on 4/16/2024 (er).
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9903302), filed by Sierra Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rettig, Madeline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. City of Columbus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Simmons
Represented By: Edward Reilley Forman
Represented By: Helen M. Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Vardaro
Represented By: John Spenceley Marshall
Represented By: Madeline Jean Rettig
Represented By: Samuel Micah Schlein
Represented By: Frederick Martin Gittes
Represented By: Louis Abraham Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Sarah Feldkamp
Represented By: Westley Matthew Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase W. Rogers
Represented By: Westley Matthew Phillips
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Sarah Feldkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall C. Beam
Represented By: Lee Ann Rabe
Represented By: Alexandra Nicole Pickerill
Represented By: Sarah Feldkamp
Represented By: Westley Matthew Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?