Chapman v. Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Tasha Chapman
Defendant: Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority, Colsultants to Government and Industry Incorporated, 4 Real Estate and Heels Homes Ltd
Case Number: 2:2024cv01789
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the May 7, 2024 Order: The Court ADOPTS the R&R without further review and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Court ADOPTS the R&R without further review and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/7/2024. (jk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Acceptance of R&R by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman re #4 Order and Initial Screen R&R. (mas)
April 22, 2024 Set Deadline: Objections to R&R due by 5/6/2024. (vb)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND INITIAL SCREEN R&R: Granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis & Denying #2 Motion to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED in its entirety for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Court certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that for the foregoing reasons an appeal of any Order adopting this Report and Recommendation would not be taken in good faith and therefore deny Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Response to objections must be filed within 14 days after being served with a copy. Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/22/2024. (vb) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification).
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against 4 Real Estate, Colsultants to Government and Industry Incorporated, Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority, Heels Homes Ltd, filed by Tasha Chapman. (jlk)
April 19, 2024 This entry is for statistical purposes. jlk
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION by Pro Se Litigant to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Rights by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman. (mas).
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tasha Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 USM Forms) (mas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Metropolitan Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colsultants to Government and Industry Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heels Homes Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?