Doe (L.M.H.) v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane (L.M.H.) Doe
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc., RRF Holding Company, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, FMW RRI II LLC, FMW RRI OPCO LLC and BW RRI II LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01823
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Algenon L Marbley
3 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order REMARK: This entry is being created for statistical purposes regarding an Order filed 5/24/2024.
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER issued as to the In: Re: Hotel TVPRA Litigation. Signed by Judge Algenon Marbley & Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/24/2024. (vb)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to RRI West Management, LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to RRF Holding Company, LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Red Roof Inns, Inc. on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Red Roof Franchising, LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to FMW RRI OPCO LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to FMW RRI II LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to BW RRI II LLC on 5/14/2024, answer due 7/15/2024. (Zaring, Lisa)
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe Amended Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Coordination and Request for Case Management Conference, Entry of Proposed Case Management order No. 1 and Appointment of Interim Coordination Counsel (Jonson, George)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Coordination and Request for Case Management Conference, Entry of Proposed Case Management order No. 1 and Appointment of Interim Coordination Counsel (Blevins, Bryan)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 2:24-cv-1823 and 2:19-cv-755 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 30, 2024. (jlk)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bryan O. Blevins, Jr., Matthew C. Matheny, Colin D. Moore, and Ashlynn K. Alexander as co-counsel. Co-counsel are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 4/24/2024. (mas)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $800 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9926186) of Bryan O. Blevins; Matthew C. Matheny; Colin D. Moore; Ashlynn K. Alexander by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Attachments: #1 Bryan O. Blevins COGS, #2 Matthew C. Matheny COGS, #3 Colin D. Moore COGS, #4 Ashlynn K. Alexander COGS) (Jonson, George)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Jonson, George)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Demetrios Jonson for Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe (Jonson, George)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George Demetrios Jonson for Plaintiff Jane (L.M.H.) Doe (Jonson, George)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against BW RRI II LLC, FMW RRI II LLC, FMW RRI OPCO LLC, RRF Holding Company, LLC, RRI West Management, LLC, Red Roof Franchising, LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9924559), filed by Jane (L.M.H.) Doe. (Jonson, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe (L.M.H.) v. Red Roof Inns, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane (L.M.H.) Doe
Represented By: Lisa Marie Zaring
Represented By: George Demetrios Jonson
Represented By: Ashlynn K. Alexander
Represented By: Bryan O. Blevins, Jr.
Represented By: Colin David Moore
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRF Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Roof Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRI West Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMW RRI II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMW RRI OPCO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW RRI II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?