Lewis v. City of Columbus, Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Donovan L. Lewis
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio and Chief Elaine Bryant
Intervenor: Fraternal Order of Police, Capital City Lodge #9
Case Number: 2:2024cv01841
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Estate of Donovan L. Lewis. (Elliott, Rex)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2024 has been vacated. Joinder of Parties/Motions to Amend due by 9/30/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 6/20/2024, or as to the Proposed Intervenor Defendant, 14 days after the Court grants the Proposed Intervenor's Motion to Intervene, whichever is later. Discovery due by 6/30/2025. Dispositive motions due by 8/29/2025. Primary Expert due by 2/18/2025. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/8/2025. Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Settlement Demand due by 8/30/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 9/30/2024. Mediation Deadline: 2/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/6/2024. (er)
June 5, 2024 Filing 13 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Estate of Donovan L. Lewis. (Cooper, C. Benjamin)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The Court STRIKES #10 Answer to Complaint filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Capital City Lodge #9. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/28/2024. (jk)
May 27, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendant Fraternal Order of Police, Capital City Lodge #9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement between City of Columbus and FOP (2020-2023), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Division Directive 1.01, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Division Directive 8.05, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - U.S. v. City of Columbus) (Lipperman, Lathan)
May 27, 2024 Filing 10 ***STRICKEN*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Fraternal Order of Police, Capital City Lodge #9. (Lipperman, Lathan)
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2024 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Chief Elaine Bryant. (Dirisamer, David)
May 21, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Chief Elaine Bryant, City of Columbus, Ohio. (Phillips, Westley)
May 17, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Chief Elaine Bryant. Chief Elaine Bryant served on 5/13/2024, answer due 6/3/2024. (mas)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk- A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to named defendants via certified mail. (mas)
May 1, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chief Elaine Bryant, City of Columbus, Ohio. (mas)
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Chief Elaine Bryant (Elliott, Rex)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. The City of Columbus, Ohio (Elliott, Rex)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9925948), filed by Estate of Donovan L. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Elliott, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. City of Columbus, Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Donovan L. Lewis
Represented By: Barton Ryan Keyes
Represented By: Rex H Elliott
Represented By: C. Benjamin Cooper
Represented By: Michael L Wright
Represented By: Kaela King
Represented By: Richard W Schulte
Represented By: Robert Leroy Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus, Ohio
Represented By: Westley Matthew Phillips
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Represented By: Dexter Warren Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Elaine Bryant
Represented By: Westley Matthew Phillips
Represented By: Alana Valle Tanoury
Represented By: Dexter Warren Dorsey
Represented By: David J. Dirisamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Fraternal Order of Police, Capital City Lodge #9
Represented By: Nicole E Rager
Represented By: Lathan Lipperman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?