Burks v. Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Plaintiff: Jordan Burks
Defendant: Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency and CSEA
Case Number: 2:2024cv02330
Filed: May 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 48 U.S.C. ยง 1985 Conspiracy/Deprivation Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2024 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency. (Lecklider, Austin) Modified text on 6/27/2024 (er).
June 25, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Enforce Cease and desist immediately #2 Summons Issued to Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency by Plaintiff Jordan Burks. (Attachments: #1 Env.) (jlk)
June 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE : The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2024 10:00 AM is VACATED. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 14, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Jordan Burks. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (sem)
June 11, 2024 Filing 8 Letter from Jordan A. Burks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jlk)
June 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency. (Lecklider, Austin)
June 5, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Allen Lecklider, IV for Defendant Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency (Lecklider, Austin)
May 21, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency. Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency served on 5/16/2024, answer due 6/6/2024. (jlk)
May 10, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's office received Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 200006276 (mve)
May 10, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency. (jlk)
May 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency, filed by Jordan Burks Plaintiff and Jordan Andrew Burks Claimant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burks v. Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Licking County Child Support Enforcement Agency
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Carnes
Represented By: Austin Allen Lecklider, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSEA
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Carnes
Represented By: Austin Allen Lecklider, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?