Davis v. Lifetime Capital Inc
Case Number: 3:2004cv00059
Filed: February 19, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER - It is hereby ordered that the above-captioned cause be administratively processed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 9/29/17. (pb) AO Processing/Action Stayed awaiting a ruling from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1508 DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. The Receiver's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 1486 ) is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment in favor of the Receiver; and 2. Plaintiffs/Intervenors Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (Doc. #s 1488 , 1490 , 1492 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/29/16. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 ORDER denying 1428 the Receiver's Motion for Default Judgment against Natlis Capital LLC and accepting Natlis' Answer to the Receiver's Counterclaims as filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 4/8/2015. (rms)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER - The 1386 Receiver's Combined Motion to Allow and Disallow Certain Claims and/or to Release Escrowed Funds is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 3/31/2015. (rms)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 ORDER granting 1333 Motion to Intervene; granting 1335 Motion to Intervene; granting 1336 Motion to Intervene; granting 1337 Motion to Intervene; granting 1339 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 03/27/14. (pb1)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER - It is hereby ordered that the above captioned cause be stayed and administratively processed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 9/28/12. (kje1)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 ORDER denying 1213 Motion to Stay; denying 1214 Motion to Stay; denying 1215 Motion to Stay all as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 9/14/12. (kje1)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 AMENDED ORDER - re 1227 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 1/20/2012. (NOTE: This Amended Order only Amends Order to take off Judge Walter H. Rice's name in case caption) (kje1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Lifetime Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?