Doyle v. McConagha et al Featured Case

Due process claim by library patron after he was barred from the library, for allegedly harassing another patron

Plaintiff: Wayne Doyle
Defendant: John McConagha and Clark County Library
Case Number: 3:2007cv00003
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2009 89 MANDATE of USCA as to 78 Notice of Appeal filed by Wayne Doyle - the judgment of the district court is affirmed. (sc1, )
March 12, 2009 88 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 78 Notice of Appeal - the judgment of the district court is affirmed. (sc1, )
May 14, 2008 87 Featured Case USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 1070 re 78 Notice of Appeal filed by Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
November 9, 2007 86 Featured Case NOTICE TO THE COURT OF APPEALS - The Court of Appeals is hereby notified that no payment or other communication has been received from Plaintiff in this regard. (dp1 )
October 4, 2007 85 Featured Case DEFICIENCY ORDER - DISTRICT JUDGE ROSE HAVING ADOPTED THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND HAVING THEREBY DENIED PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF PAY THE APPELLATE FILING FEE OF $455 TO THE CLERK OF THIS COURT NO LATER THAN NOVEMBER 3, 2007. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THE APPEAL. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 10/03/2007. (gh1, )
October 2, 2007 84 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Clark County Library, John McConagha against Wayne Doyle. Notice of disposal attached. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/2/07. (bev1, )
October 2, 2007 83 Featured Case ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT WAYNE DOYLE'S OBJECTIONS (Doc. 81 ) TO THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. 80 ) REGARDING DOYLE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS; ADOPTING THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN ITS ENTIRETY; AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/2/07. (bev1, )
October 1, 2007 82 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 79 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Wayne DoyleREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 79 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Wayne Doyle filed by Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library. (Gruhin, Lois)
September 27, 2007 81 Featured Case OBJECTION to 80 Report and Recommendations (ENTITLED) Plaintiff Wayne Doyles Objections to Judge Merz 9/17/07 Report and Recommendations on Motion To Appeal In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
September 20, 2007 Featured Case USCA Case Number 07-4152 for 78 Notice of Appeal filed by Wayne Doyle. (mkb1, )
September 17, 2007 80 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 79 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Wayne Doyle - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Court deny Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and order him to pay the filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 10/4/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 9/15/2007. (dp1 )
September 5, 2007 79 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
September 5, 2007 78 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL by Wayne Doyle. (Filing fee $ 455; Motion to Appeal in forma pauperis follows doc. 79 (bev1, ) Modified on 9/12/2007 (bev1, ).
August 29, 2007 Featured Case NOTATION ORDER denying 77 Motion due to case previously being terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 8-29-07. (de, )
August 28, 2007 77 Featured Case MOTION: 1. This Court to allow Plaintiff Wayne Doyle leave to file a response to Defendant's 8/9/2007 response to Plaintiff's objection to Magistrate Judge's substituted report and recommendations; decisions and entry (out of rule) fore Plaintiff Wayne Doyle (Mistakenly) to the dates mixed up to respond. 2. Objection to any and all of Judge Thomas M. Rose 8/20/2007 entry and order adopting Chief Magistrate Merz's substitute report and recommendations (Doc. 65 ) and correction of report and recommendations (Doc. 66 ) overuling and denying Plaintiff's objections and motions (Doc. 67 ) dismissing Plaintiff's complaint. 3. Motion for Judge Rose and Magistrate Merz to remove themselves as (Judges) over this case for too many mistakes have been made on the record to discriminate against Plaintiff Wayne Doyle civil rights as a citizen of the United States. (bev1, )
August 20, 2007 76 Featured Case JUDGMENT: Plaintiff Complaint is Dismissed. Notice of Disposal attached. (bev1, )
August 20, 2007 75 Featured Case ENTRY AND ORDER ADOPTING CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ'S SUBSTITUTEREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 65 ) AND CORRECTION OF REPORT ANDRECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 66 ) OVERRULING AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'SOBJECTIONS AND MOTIONS (DOC. 67 ) DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT,TERMINATION ENTRY. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 8/20/07. (bev1, )
August 13, 2007 74 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 67 MOTION Entitled: for Objection to any and all of the Recommendations and Orders handed down by this Court including Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Substituted Report and Recommendations; Decision and Entry filed by Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library. (Gruhin, Lois)
August 9, 2007 73 Featured Case ...DELETE, COUNSEL TO RESUBMIT USING CORRECT EVENT, COUNSEL NOTIFIED....REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 MOTION Entitled: for Objection to any and all of the Recommendations and Orders handed down by this Court including Defendant's Response to Magistrate Judge's Substituted Report and Recommnedations; Decision and Entry filed by Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library. (Gruhin, Lois) Modified on 8/13/2007 (phil1, ).
July 30, 2007 72 Featured Case MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 30, 2007 71 Featured Case MOTION for Case to be Transferred to Columbus, Ohio by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 30, 2007 70 Featured Case MOTION For a Definite Statement re 57 , 65 , and 66 by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 30, 2007 69 Featured Case MOTION For Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 30, 2007 68 Featured Case MOTION For the Court Docket to be Corrected by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 30, 2007 67 Featured Case MOTION (Entitled): For Objection to any and all of the Recommendations and Orders handed down by this Court 7/2,7/2007. by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
July 17, 2007 66 Featured Case CORRECTION TO SUBSTITUTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS -Page 9 should reflect the following change: Finally, because neither the Library nor Mr. McConagha violated any of Mr. Doyle's constitutional rights, MR MCCONAGHA is entitled to qualified immunity from any monetary liability for his actions with respect to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 7/17/07. (dp1 )
July 5, 2007 65 Featured Case SUBSTITUTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; DECISION AND ENTRY - Objection to Substituted Report and Recommendation is due not later than 7/24/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 7/3/07. (dp1 )
July 2, 2007 64 Featured Case MOTION for Magistrate Judge Merz to be disqualified and removed as Judge by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
July 2, 2007 63 Featured Case MOTION for this case to be transferred to Columbus, Ohio by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
July 2, 2007 62 Featured Case MOTION for Definite Statement (clarity) concerning the 6/21/2007 Court entry by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
July 2, 2007 61 Featured Case MOTION for Finding of Fact and Conclusion of Law concerning (all) of Magistrate Merz's Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
July 2, 2007 60 Featured Case MOTION for the Court docket to be corrected to reflect (all) of the filings and orders filed with this court by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
July 2, 2007 59 Featured Case OBJECTION to 57 Report and Recommendations entitled MOTION for (OBJECTION) to any and all of the Recommendations and Orders handed down by this Court including 6/21/2007 by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
June 25, 2007 58 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, 45 MOTION to Dismiss entitled "Memorandum Contra Defendant's March 30, 2007 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 6# 6 Exhibit 7# 7 Exhibit 8# 8 Exhibit 9# 9 Exhibit 10# 10 Exhibit 11# 11 Exhibit 12) *** Please note that although Ex 4 is mentioned in Motion, Plaintiff did not tender an Exhibit 4. (dp1)
June 21, 2007 57 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that even when Plaintiff's amended complaint is liberally construed, it fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and should be dismissed without prejudice on that basis.Objections to R&R due by 7/11/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 6/21/07. (dp1)
May 9, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER denying 56 Motion for clarification as legally frivolous. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 5/9/2007. (Merz, Michael)
May 7, 2007 56 Featured Case Pro Se MOTION for Clarity concerning this Court's April 27, 2007 Decision and Order 53 Denying Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. Motions referred to Judge Michael R. Merz. (bev1, )
May 1, 2007 55 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS(DOC. 25 ) AFFIRMING THE COURT'S PREVIOUS ADOPTION OF THE REPORTS ANDRECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 5 AND DOC. 10 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGEIN THEIR ENTIRETY, OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARYRESTRAINING ORDERS (DOC. 2 AND DOC. 9 ), ADOPTION IN THEIR ENTIRETY OFTHE DECISIONS AND ORDERS (DOC. 17 AND DOC. 22 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATEJUDGE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 5/1/07. (bev1, )
April 30, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER finding as moot [] Motion ; finding as moot 50 Motion: requests dealt with in separate orders. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 4/30/2007. (Merz, Michael)
April 30, 2007 54 Featured Case Addendum Memorandum in Support of 52 Plaintiff's April 25, 2007 Reconsideration Motion filed by Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
April 27, 2007 53 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER denying 52 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 4/27/07. (dp1 )
April 25, 2007 52 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. Motions referred to Michael R Merz. (phil1, )
April 20, 2007 51 Featured Case ENTRY RESPONDING TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR (CLARITY); ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; ORDER TO THE CLERK 49 50 - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to employ an attorney is not well taken. Plaintiff's time to respond to Motion to Dismiss is extended to and including 5/1/2007. THE CLERK IS INSTRUCTED NOT TO RE-SCAN AND DOCKET ATTACHMENTS TO MOTIONS IN THIS CASE WHICH APPEAR TO BE DOCUMENTS ALREADY FILED WITHOUT FURTHER INSTRUCTIONS FROM THE COURT. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 4/19/07. (dp1 )
April 18, 2007 50 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to hire legal counsel and respond to defendant John Mc Conagha 3/30/07 motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (rew )
April 18, 2007 Featured Case MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for extension of time to response defendant motion to dismiss by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (rew ) document deleted and refiled on 4/20/2007 to correct ecf filing event (tto, ).
April 18, 2007 49 Featured Case MOTION to Amend complaint and motion for clarity from the court concerning by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (rew )
April 16, 2007 48 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON PLAINTIFF'SFOURTH RENEWED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4/16/07. (bev1, )
April 2, 2007 47 Featured Case ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF - Plaintiff is required to respond to the Amended Motion to Dismiss not later than 4/23/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 4/2/07. (dp1 )
March 31, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER denying 30 Motion for restraining order per TMR adoption of 3/19/2007 R&R, finding as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss in light of filing of amended motion. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/31/2007. (Merz, Michael)
March 30, 2007 46 Featured Case Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library. Responses due by 4/23/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Amended Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Civil Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(Gruhin, Lois)
March 30, 2007 45 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library. Responses due by 4/23/2007 (Attachments: # 1)(Gruhin, Lois)
March 27, 2007 44 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS . Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 03/27/07. (phil1, )
March 23, 2007 43 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION TO CLARIFY. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/23/07. (dp1 )
March 23, 2007 42 Featured Case MOTION to Clarify by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle 39 , 38 , 27 , 28 , 33 . (pes, )
March 22, 2007 41 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed John McConagha served on 3/10/2007, answer due 3/30/2007; Clark County Library served on 3/10/2007, answer due 3/30/2007. (ep1, )
March 20, 2007 40 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Lois Ann Gruhin Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library (Gruhin, Lois)
March 19, 2007 39 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 38 MOTION Present and 4th Renewed Emergency Restraining Order filed by Wayne Doyle - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion be denied. FURTHER, Plaintiff is notified that the Court does not yet have any proof that the Summons and Complaint have been served on either Defendant. Failure to make proper service by May 3, 2007 may result in dismissal for want of prosecution. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/19/07. (dp1 )
March 16, 2007 38 Featured Case MOTION Present and 4th Renewed Emergency Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5)(kch)
March 14, 2007 37 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 36 RENEWED REQUESTS FOR DEFINITE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/14/07. (dp1 )
March 13, 2007 36 Featured Case Objection to all of Judge Rose Orders, for the courts record do not reflect the record which has been filed with the clerk by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (srj, )
March 1, 2007 35 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 32 SECOND MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/1/07. (dp1 )
March 1, 2007 34 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION Restraining Order filed by Wayne Doyle - IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's third Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 3/1/07. (dp1 )
February 28, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion definite statement: plaintiff has 120 days from the date of filing the Complaint to obtain service of process on the Defendants; all other requested relief is denied. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 2/28/2007. (mm1, )
February 28, 2007 33 Featured Case Summons Issued as to John McConagha and Clark County Library. (bev1, )
February 28, 2007 32 Featured Case MOTION for Plaintiff to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
February 28, 2007 31 Featured Case MOTION Definite Statement Request Explanation Objection and Reconsideration Concerning this court's 2/21/07 and 2/22/07 Entry Order Decision denying Plaintiff's Motion for Definite Statement and or Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle.(bev1, ) Modified on 2/28/2007 (bev1, ).
February 28, 2007 30 Featured Case Renewed Restraining Order MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (bev1, )
February 28, 2007 29 Featured Case AMENDED ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS (DOC. 25 )AFFIRMING THE COURT'S PREVIOUS ADOPTION OF THE REPORTS ANDRECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 5 AND DOC. 10 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGEIN THEIR ENTIRETY, OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARYRESTRAINING ORDERS (DOC. 2 AND DOC. 9 ), ADOPTION IN THEIR ENTIRETY OFTHE DECISIONS AND ORDERS (DOC. 17 AND DOC. 22 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATEJUDGE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/28/07. (bev1, )
February 22, 2007 28 Featured Case ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS (DOC. 25 ) AFFIRMING THE COURT'S PREVIOUS ADOPTION OF THE REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 5 AND DOC. 8 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN THEIR ENTIRETY, ADOPTION, IN THEIR ENTIRETY OF THE DECISIONS AND ORDERS (DOC. 17 AND DOC. 22 ) OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 2/22/07. (bev1, ) Modified on 2/22/2007 (bev1, ).
February 21, 2007 27 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER DENYING 25 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFINITE STATEMENT AND/OR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Unless Plaintiff causes process to be issued for service not later than 3/1/2007, the Magistrate Judge will recommend that this case be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 2/21/07. (dp1 )
February 20, 2007 Featured Case Notice of Correction: Docket entry #'s 25 and 26 were changed to correct ECF filing order. (sr)
February 20, 2007 26 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 22, 2007 before Chief Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. Court Reporter: Britton & Associates. (kopf, ) Modified on 2/20/2007 - docket number changed from 25 to 26 to correct ECF filing order (sr).
February 16, 2007 25 Featured Case Objection re 22 - Decision and Order Motion For More Definite Statement Finding of Fact and Conclusion of Law Concerning All Questions Asked and Answered By The Court filed by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (sr) Modified on 2/20/2007 - docket number changed from 26 to 25 to ECF filing(sr).
February 14, 2007 24 Featured Case *** STRICKEN *** (transcript is not signed - court reporter to refile w/ sig) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 22, 2007 before Judge Michael R. Merz. Court Reporter: Britton & Associates. (Attachments: # 1) (kopf1, ) Modified on 2/15/2007 to strike after advising Britton & Associates (dp1).
February 8, 2007 23 Featured Case ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS (DOC. 8 ), ADOPTING CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 5 ) AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 10 ) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/8/07. (bev1, ) Modified on 2/15/2007 to edit text (sc1, ).
February 2, 2007 22 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER DENYING IN PART AND FINDING MOOT IN PART 21 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Plaintiff is reminded that the Court cannot consider granting any further relief in this case until process has been served on the Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 2/2/07. (dp1 )
February 1, 2007 21 Featured Case MOTION for Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law & Objection to 17 Decision & Order by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2)(er )
January 30, 2007 20 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 01/05/07 before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. Court Reporter: Debra Futrell transcription of Tape Number: MRM070105-094102. (gh1, )
January 26, 2007 19 Featured Case ORDER for transcript of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held 01/22/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 01/26/2007. (gh1, )
January 26, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER for transcript of telephone conference held 01/05/07. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 01/26/2007. (gh1, )
January 25, 2007 17 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER - The Report and Recommendations 15 is WITHDRAWN. The Motion to Transfer to Columbus is DENIED. Request for Transcription is GRANTED - Clerk shall arrange for transcription of proceedings of 1/5/2007 and 1/22/2007 and Plaintiff may obtain a copy thereof from court reporter if he so desires. Plaintiff shall promptly cause Clerk to issue process and shall have said process served. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/25/07. (dp1 )
January 24, 2007 16 Featured Case REQUEST for Transcript by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (kch)
January 24, 2007 15 Featured Case OBJECTION to 13 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (kch)
January 24, 2007 14 Featured Case MOTION to Change Venue back to Columbus, Renewed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (kch)
January 22, 2007 13 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS RECOMMENDED that the preliminary injunctive relief sought be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/22/07. (dp1 )
January 22, 2007 12 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R Merz: Plaintiff Wayne Doyle failed to appear Preliminary Injuction Hearing set for 1/22/07; Defendant was represented by Lauren Ross. Attorney Ross stated for the record Plaintiff advised her via telephone on Friday he had no transportation to court and would not be in attendance. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is taken under advisement and the parties will be advised in writing of the Court's decision. (Court Reporter Cathy Schutte-Stant.)(Digital Recording MRM070122-085342) (gh1, )
January 16, 2007 11 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against John McConagha, Clark County Library, filed by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle - (per notation order above, as attached to 6 )(dp1 )
January 16, 2007 10 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS AGAIN RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED that Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be denied, pending a hearing on the preliminary injunction motion. Objections to R&R due by 2/2/2007. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/16/07. (dp1 )
January 12, 2007 9 Featured Case RENEWED MOTION for a "Emergency" Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
January 12, 2007 8 Featured Case OBJECTION to 5 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (phil1, )
January 12, 2007 7 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by William R Groves Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library (Groves, William)
January 10, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER granting 6 Motion to amend complaint because Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 allows one amendment without court permission before a responsive pleading has been filed. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/10/2007. (Merz, Michael)
January 8, 2007 6 Featured Case MOTION for plaintifff to amend complaint by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (rew )
January 8, 2007 5 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wayne Doyle - IT IS RESPECTFULLY RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be denied without prejudice to a possible preliminary injunction. The case is set for a preliminary injunction hearing on 1/22/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Michael R Merz. Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/8/07. (dp1)
January 5, 2007 4 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R Merz: Telephone Conference regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order held on 1/5/2007 and attended via telephone by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle and Lauren Ross for Defendant (Tape #MRM070105-094102.) (gh1, )
January 4, 2007 3 Featured Case COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle, Defendants John McConagha, Clark County Library.(ep1, )
January 3, 2007 Featured Case Notation ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge Michael R Merz on 1/3/2007. (Merz, Michael)
January 3, 2007 2 Featured Case MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (rew )
January 3, 2007 1 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Wayne Doyle. (Attachments: # 1 civil cover sheet# 2 complaint)(rew )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. McConagha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McConagha
Represented By: Lois Ann Gruhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Library
Represented By: Lois Ann Gruhin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?